This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/04/2021 at 06:11:42 (UTC).

David Wit, et al v. United Behavioral Health

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 David Wit filed an Other lawsuit against United Behavioral Health. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15193

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiffs

MARY JONES

LINDA TILLITT

Plaintiff / Appellees

NATASHA WIT

BRANDT PFEIFER, on behalf of the Estate of his deceased wife, Lauralee Pfeifer

CORINNA KLEIN

DAVID WIT

DAVID HAFFNER, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

BRIAN MUIR

GARY ALEXANDER, on his own behalf and on behalf of his beneficiary son, Jordan Alexander

CECILIA HOLDNAK, on behalf of herself, her daughter Emily Holdnak

LORI FLANZRAICH, on behalf of her daughter Casey Flanzraich

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

Amicus Curiae

AMERICA'S HEALTH INSURANCE PLANS (AHIP)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Caroline E. Reynolds

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Brian Hufford

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Meiram Bendat

Attorney at Psych-Appeal, Inc

7 West Figueroa Street, Suite 300, Pmb #300059

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Adam Abelson

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

100 E. Pratt Street, Suite 2440

Baltimore, MD 21202

Andrew N. Goldfarb

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Jason Cowart

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

David A. Reiser

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

April N. Ross

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Miguel A. Estrada

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Jennifer S. Romano

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nathaniel Philip Bualat

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Thomas F. Koegel

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew Holmer

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Geoffrey Manson Sigler Esquire

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Lucas C. Townsend

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Matthew Rozen

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Michael B. Kimberly

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 North Capitol Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#23

#21

#20

#19

17 #8

ER Vol 7

17 #7

ER Vol 6

17 #6

ER Vol 5

17 #5

ER Vol 4

17 #4

ER Vol 3

17 #3

ER Vol 2

17 #2

ER Vol 1

#10

#9

#8

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#24) Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 21 ] filed by America's Health Insurance Plans (AHIP). [12059772] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (SD) [Entered: 03/31/2021 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 21 ] submitted by America's Health Insurance Plans (AHIP) is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12056016] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (KT) [Entered: 03/29/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docket(#22) Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae America's Health Insurance Plans (AHIP). [12056013] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (KT) [Entered: 03/29/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by America's Health Insurance Plans. Date of service: 03/26/2021. [12054691] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Kimberly, Michael) [Entered: 03/26/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Miguel A. Estrada for Appellant United Behavioral Health in 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194 response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 03/23/2021. [12051195] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 03/23/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SSR): The parties joint motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 13 ]) to modify the briefing schedule is granted. The consolidated opening brief has been submitted. The Clerk will file the brief upon resolution of the pending motion to seal. The consolidated answering brief is due May 12, 2021. The optional consolidated reply brief is due June 2, 2021. In light of the February 12, 2021 order placing these consolidated cases on the August 2021 calendar, no streamlined extensions of time will be approved under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a), and the court is not inclined to grant any further motions for extensions of time to file the briefs. [12044112] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (JBS) [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#18) Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant United Behavioral Health in 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194 motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document. Type of document: excerpts of record. Date of service: 03/15/2021. [12041870] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of motion and excerpts of record. 03/23/2021 by KT] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 03/15/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant United Behavioral Health in 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194. Date of service: 03/15/2021. [12041848] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDFs of excerpts of record. 03/23/2021 by KT] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 03/15/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant United Behavioral Health in 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194. Date of service: 03/15/2021. [12041813] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of opening brief. 03/23/2021 by KT] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 03/15/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docket(#15) Added Attorney(s) David A. Reiser for party(s) Appellee David Haffner Appellee Corinna Klein Appellee Gary Alexander. [12032125] [20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15194, 21-15193] (RL) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/12/2021. [12002365] [21-15193] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12001009] (LW) [Entered: 02/11/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health Unopposed Motion to consolidate cases 20-17363, 20-17364, 21-15193, 21-15194. Date of service: 02/08/2021. [11996612] [21-15193] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorneys Geoffrey Manson Sigler, Lucas C. Townsend and Matthew Rozen for Appellant United Behavioral Health, in case 21-15193. [11995013] (HH) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew S. Rozen (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994981] [21-15193] (Rozen, Matthew) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lucas C. Townsend (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994967] [21-15193] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Geoffrey M. Sigler (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994959] [21-15193] (Sigler, Geoffrey) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney Miguel A. Estrada for Appellant United Behavioral Health, in case 21-15193. [11994954] (HH) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Miguel A. Estrada (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 02/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11994946] [21-15193] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant United Behavioral Health Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/10/2021. Appellant United Behavioral Health opening brief due 04/05/2021. Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Mary Jones, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit answering brief due 05/05/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11990940] (JBS) [Entered: 02/03/2021 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARY ALEXANDER, on his own behalf and on behalf of his beneficiary son, Jordan Alexander is a litigant

Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL B. KIMBERLY