This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/01/2021 at 06:09:57 (UTC).

David Wit, et al v. United Behavioral Health

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 David Wit filed an Other lawsuit against United Behavioral Health. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-17363

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiffs

MARY JONES

LINDA TILLITT

Plaintiff / Appellees

NATASHA WIT

BRANDT PFEIFER, on behalf of the Estate of his deceased wife, Lauralee Pfeifer

CORINNA KLEIN

DAVID WIT

DAVID HAFFNER, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

BRIAN MUIR

GARY ALEXANDER, on his own behalf and on behalf of his beneficiary son, Jordan Alexander

CECILIA HOLDNAK, on behalf of herself, her daughter Emily Holdnak

LORI FLANZRAICH, on behalf of her daughter Casey Flanzraich

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Meiram Bendat

Attorney at Psych-Appeal, Inc

8560 West Sunset Boulevard, Suite 500

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Brian Hufford

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Caroline E. Reynolds

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Jason Cowart

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

485 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Andrew N. Goldfarb

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Adam Abelson

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

100 E. Pratt Street, Suite 2440

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Nathaniel Philip Bualat

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

April N. Ross

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Thomas F. Koegel

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew Holmer

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jennifer S. Romano

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

515 South Flower Street, 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Miguel A. Estrada

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Geoffrey Manson Sigler Esquire

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Lucas C. Townsend

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Matthew Rozen

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#6

#13

#14

#15

16 #1

Main Document

16 #2

Declaration of Dr. Martin Rosenzweig

16 #3

Declaration of Chad Burkholder

16 #4

Appendix Volume I

16 #5

Appendix Volume II

#17

#18

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health reply to response (). Date of service: 01/22/2021. [11977821] [20-17363] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 01/22/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit response to motion ([ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 01/15/2021. [11965832] [20-17363] (Reynolds, Caroline) [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 01/05/2021. [11952313] [20-17363] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 01/05/2021 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health Unopposed Motion to consolidate cases 20-17363, 20-17364. Date of service: 12/31/2020. [11949846] [20-17363] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 12/31/2020 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED -DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/02/2021, 9:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11929207] [20-17363, 20-17364] (BLS) [Entered: 12/16/2020 07:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/11/2020. [11924832] [20-17363] (Reynolds, Caroline) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#12) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/11/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11924351]. [20-17363] (AD) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Lucas C. Townsend, Matthew Rozen for party(s) Appellant United Behavioral Health, in case 20-17363. [11924205] (QDL) [Entered: 12/11/2020 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew S. Rozen (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 12/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11924125] [20-17363] (Rozen, Matthew) [Entered: 12/11/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lucas C. Townsend (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 12/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11924110] [20-17363] (Townsend, Lucas) [Entered: 12/11/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Geoffrey Manson Sigler for party(s) Appellant United Behavioral Health, in case 20-17363. [11924109] (QDL) [Entered: 12/11/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Geoffrey M. Sigler (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 12/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11924099] [20-17363] (Sigler, Geoffrey) [Entered: 12/11/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant United Behavioral Health Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/11/2020. [11923914] [20-17363] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 12/11/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Miguel A. Estrada for party(s) Appellant United Behavioral Health, in case 20-17363. [11923879] (QDL) [Entered: 12/11/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Miguel A. Estrada (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant United Behavioral Health. Date of service: 12/10/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11923534] [20-17363] (Estrada, Miguel) [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Adam Abelson for party(s) Appellee Cecilia Holdnak, Appellee David Haffner, Appellee Corinna Klein, Appellee Brian Muir, Appellee David Wit, Appellee Gary Alexander, Appellee Lori Flanzraich, Appellee Brandt Pfeifer, Appellee Linda Tillitt and Appellee Natasha Wit, in case 20-17363. [11921826] (QDL) [Entered: 12/10/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam Abelson (Zuckerman Spaeder LLP, 100 East Pratt Street, Suite 2440, Baltimore, MD 21202) for Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit. Date of service: 12/10/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11921678] [20-17363] (Abelson, Adam) [Entered: 12/10/2020 07:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant United Behavioral Health Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/10/2020. Transcript ordered by 01/04/2021. Transcript due 02/01/2021. Appellant United Behavioral Health opening brief due 03/15/2021. Appellees Gary Alexander, Lori Flanzraich, David Haffner, Cecilia Holdnak, Mary Jones, Corinna Klein, Brian Muir, Brandt Pfeifer, Linda Tillitt, David Wit and Natasha Wit answering brief due 04/14/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11914182] (JBS) [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVID HAFFNER, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated is a litigant

Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant