This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/03/2022 at 06:01:06 (UTC).

David Vance v. DIRECTV, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 David Vance filed an Other lawsuit against DIRECTV, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2041

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

DAVID VANCE

ROXIE VANCE

CARLA SHULTZ, individually and on behalf of a class of all persons and entities similarly situated

Defendant / Appellant

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John William Barrett

Attorney at BAILEY & GLASSER, LLP

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Leslie Agnes Brueckner

Attorney at PUBLIC JUSTICE, PC

475 14Th Street

Oakland, CA 94612

Benjamin James Hogan

Attorney at BAILEY & GLASSER, LLP

6 Canyon Road

Morgantown, WV 26508

Matthew P. McCue

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MATTHEW P. MCCUE

1 South Avenue

Natick, MA 01760

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Rolf Adler

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Patrick James Fuster

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Lauren R. Goldman

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0000

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Carmen N. Longoria-Green

Attorney at MAYER BROWN, LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001241276] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 09:56 AM]

#2

(#2) Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 22-250. Record complete? Yes. [1001241284] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:00 AM]

#3

(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to appellants - after grant of permission to appeal Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. [1001241301] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:07 AM]

#4

(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. [1001241305] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:11 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin J. Hogan for Carla Shultz, David Vance and Roxie Vance. [1001249742] [22-2041] Benjamin Hogan [Entered: 10/18/2022 10:41 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John W. Barrett for Carla Shultz, David Vance and Roxie Vance. [1001249747] [22-2041] John Barrett [Entered: 10/18/2022 10:43 AM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carla Shultz, David Vance and Roxie Vance. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001249749] [22-2041] John Barrett [Entered: 10/18/2022 10:45 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel Rolf Adler for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249951] [22-2041] Daniel Adler [Entered: 10/18/2022 12:56 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick J. Fuster for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249953] [22-2041] Patrick Fuster [Entered: 10/18/2022 12:58 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bradley J. Hamburger for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249954] [22-2041] Bradley Hamburger [Entered: 10/18/2022 12:59 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauren R. Goldman for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249962] [22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 10/18/2022 01:02 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DIRECTV, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001250027] [22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 10/18/2022 01:59 PM]

#13

(#13) DOCKETING STATEMENT by DIRECTV, LLC.. [1001250400] [22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 10/18/2022 11:30 PM]

#14

(#14) ORDER filed consolidating case 22-2041 with 22-1958. Copies to all parties. [1001250586] [22-1958, 22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:00 AM]

#15

(#15) Amended BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001250592] Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/07/2022. Response Brief due 01/06/2023. [22-1958, 22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:03 AM]

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION by DIRECTV, LLC in 22-1958, 22-2041 to exceed length limitations for brief , to extend filing time for briefing schedule until Opening Brief to January 23, 2023, along with an enlargement of limit to 20,000 words. Response Brief to April 10, 2023, along with an enlargement of limit to 20,000 words. Reply Brief to May 10, 2023, along with an enlargement of limit to 10,000 words... Date and method of service: 11/08/2022 ecf. [1001262837] [22-1958, 22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 11/08/2022 01:23 PM]

#17

(#17) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ] Number of days granted: 45. Opening brief and appendix due 01/23/2023. Response brief due 04/10/2023. Any reply brief due 05/10/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001262952] [22-1958, 22-2041] RP [Entered: 11/08/2022 03:24 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ] Number of days granted: 45. Opening brief and appendix due 01/23/2023. Response brief due 04/10/2023. Any reply brief due 05/10/2023. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. Copies to all parties. [1001262952] [22-1958, 22-2041] RP [Entered: 11/08/2022 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION by DIRECTV, LLC in 22-1958, 22-2041 to exceed length limitations for brief , to extend filing time for briefing schedule until Opening Brief to January 23, 2023, along with an enlargement of limit to 20,000 words. Response Brief to April 10, 2023, along with an enlargement of limit to 20,000 words. Reply Brief to May 10, 2023, along with an enlargement of limit to 10,000 words... Date and method of service: 11/08/2022 ecf. [1001262837] [22-1958, 22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 11/08/2022 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with # Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide . [1001250592] Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/07/2022. Response Brief due 01/06/2023. [22-1958, 22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed consolidating case 22-2041 with 22-1958. Copies to all parties. [1001250586] [22-1958, 22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKETING STATEMENT by DIRECTV, LLC.. [1001250400] [22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 10/18/2022 11:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DIRECTV, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001250027] [22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 10/18/2022 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauren R. Goldman for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249962] [22-2041] Lauren Goldman [Entered: 10/18/2022 01:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bradley J. Hamburger for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249954] [22-2041] Bradley Hamburger [Entered: 10/18/2022 12:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick J. Fuster for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249953] [22-2041] Patrick Fuster [Entered: 10/18/2022 12:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel Rolf Adler for DIRECTV, LLC. [1001249951] [22-2041] Daniel Adler [Entered: 10/18/2022 12:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carla Shultz, David Vance and Roxie Vance. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001249749] [22-2041] John Barrett [Entered: 10/18/2022 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John W. Barrett for Carla Shultz, David Vance and Roxie Vance. [1001249747] [22-2041] John Barrett [Entered: 10/18/2022 10:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin J. Hogan for Carla Shultz, David Vance and Roxie Vance. [1001249742] [22-2041] Benjamin Hogan [Entered: 10/18/2022 10:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. [1001241305] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to appellants - after grant of permission to appeal Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. [1001241301] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 22-250. Record complete? Yes. [1001241284] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00179-JPB-JPM. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001241276] [22-2041] RP [Entered: 10/04/2022 09:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick James Fuster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carmen N. Longoria-Green

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R. Adler