This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:56 (UTC).

David Poindexter v. Cheron Nash, Warden

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 David Poindexter filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Cheron Nash, Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-60530

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DAVID POINDEXTER

Yazoo City, MS 39194-5000

Respondent / Appellee

CHERON NASH, WARDEN, FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTE YAZOO CITY MEDIUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

David Poindexter

Attorney at FCI Yazoo City Medium

P.O. Box 5000

Yazoo City, MS 39194-5000

Brandon Sample

P.O Box 250

Rutland, VT 05702

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Marc Alexander Perez

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

501 E. Court Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Emily Smith Nobile

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1575 20Th Avenue

Gulfport, MS 39501

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. David Poindexter [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:41 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. David Poindexter [ # 9133012-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 09/26/2019 for Appellant David Poindexter [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:32 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60530] (Emily Smith Nobile ) [Entered: 08/14/2019 11:37 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Marc Alexander Perez for Ms. Cheron Nash, Warden, Federal Correctional Institute Yazoo City Medium for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60530] (Marc Alexander Perez ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:47 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102901-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60530] (Brandon Sample ) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:08 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant David Poindexter. [19-60530] (DDL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:45 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. David Poindexter to extend time to file brief as appellant until 09/26/2019 [9133012-2]. Date of service: 08/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Nobile, Perez; Attorney for Appellant: Sample [19-60530] (Brandon Sample ) [Entered: 08/29/2019 11:57 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. David Poindexter [ # 9133012-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 09/26/2019 for Appellant David Poindexter [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 08/29/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. David Poindexter to extend time to file brief as appellant until 09/26/2019 [9133012-2]. Date of service: 08/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Nobile, Perez; Attorney for Appellant: Sample [19-60530] (Brandon Sample ) [Entered: 08/29/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Emily Smith Nobile for party(s) Appellee Cheron Nash, Warden, Federal Correctional Institute Yazoo City Medium, in case 19-60530 [19-60530] (CCR) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60530] (Emily Smith Nobile ) [Entered: 08/14/2019 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant David Poindexter. [19-60530] (DDL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-60530] (DDL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Marc Alexander Perez for Appellee Cheron Nash, Warden, Federal Correctional Institute Yazoo City Medium in 19-60530 [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Marc Alexander Perez for Ms. Cheron Nash, Warden, Federal Correctional Institute Yazoo City Medium for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60530] (Marc Alexander Perez ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-150. Electronic ROA due on 08/06/2019. [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102901-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. David Poindexter. [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brandon Sample for Appellant David Poindexter in 19-60530 [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60530] (Brandon Sample ) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. David Poindexter [19-60530] (AGL) [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.