This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 06:02:41 (UTC).

David Phillips, et al v. City of Chico, et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 David Phillips filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chico. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16650

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ALEX FLIEHR, individually and in his capacity as an officer for the Chico Police Department

JEREMY GAGNEBIN, individually and in his capacity as an officer for the Chico Police Department

CITY OF CHICO, a municipal corporation

JARED CUMBER, individually and in his capacity as an officer for the Chico Police Department

Plaintiff / Appellants

CHADRICK INGRAM

Chico, CA 95926

K.T., by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Latisha Williams

DELPHINE NORMAN, individually and as a co-successor-in-interest to Decedent Desmond Phillips

DAVID PHILLIPS, individually and as a co-successor-in-interest to Decedent Desmond Phillips

DELPHINE NORMAN

Chico, CA 95926

DAVID PHILLIPS

Chico, CA 95926

K.T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Roger Allen Colvin Esquire

Attorney at Alvarez-Glasman & Colvin

13181 Crossroads Parkway North, Suite 400, West Tower

City Of Industry, CA 91746

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Benjamin Nisenbaum Esquire

Attorney at The Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street

Oakland, CA 94621

Lateef Hasani Gray

Attorney at The Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street

Oakland, CA 94621

John L. Burris Esquire

Attorney at The Law Offices of John L. Burris

7677 Oakport Street

Oakland, CA 94621

Chadrick Ingram

725 W 4Th Ave. Unit 3

Chico, CA 95926

Delphine Norman

725 W 4Th Ave. Unit 3

Chico, CA 95926

David Phillips

725 W 4Th Ave. Unit 3

Chico, CA 95926

K.T.

725 W 4Th Ave. Unit 3

Chico, CA 95926

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Counsels for appellants filed a notice of withdrawal of counsel at Docket Entry No. [8]. The docket has been amended to reflect that appellants are proceeding pro se. Appellant David Phillipss motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) to stay proceedings is treated in part as a motion for extension of time to file the opening brief and is granted. The opening brief is due December 30, 2019. The answering brief is due January 29, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11460291] (OC) [Entered: 10/10/2019 09:18 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant David Phillips motion to stay further action. Deficiencies: None. Served on 09/18/2019. [11436628] (CW) [Entered: 09/19/2019 06:58 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Appellants motions (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 4 ] & [ # 5 ]) to stay appellate proceedings and terminate attorneys Benjamin Nisenbaum, Esq., John L. Burris, Esq. and Lateef Hasani Gray, Esq. is denied without prejudice to filing a renewed motion which includes appellants current mailing address. See 9th Cir. R. 46-3. The previously established briefing schedule remains in place. [11430144] (OC) [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:21 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed non-party Latisha Williams document re: Motion for stay. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11423979] (RL) [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:34 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellants Chadrick Ingram, Delphine Norman and David Phillips pro se motion for stay. No service date. Deficiency: party has counsel. [11423971] (RL) [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:30 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chadrick Ingram, K.T., Delphine Norman and David Phillips Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/29/2019. [11415781] [19-16650] (Burris, John) [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:43 PM]

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Counsels for appellants filed a notice of withdrawal of counsel at Docket Entry No. [8]. The docket has been amended to reflect that appellants are proceeding pro se. Appellant David Phillipss motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) to stay proceedings is treated in part as a motion for extension of time to file the opening brief and is granted. The opening brief is due December 30, 2019. The answering brief is due January 29, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11460291] (OC) [Entered: 10/10/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#9) Terminated John L. Burris, Lateef Hasani Gray, and Benjamin Nisenbaum for David Phillips, Delphine Norman, K.T. and Chadrick Ingram. [11456125] (RL) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by John L. Burris, Esquire for Appellants Chadrick Ingram, K.T., Delphine Norman and David Phillips, Mr. Lateef Hasani Gray for Appellants Chadrick Ingram, K.T., Delphine Norman and David Phillips and Mr. Benjamin Nisenbaum, Esquire for Appellants Chadrick Ingram, K.T., Delphine Norman and David Phillips. Party proceeding without counsel: Yes, mailing address provided. Party mailing address: 725 W 4TH AVE UNIT 3 CHICO CA 95926-3734. Date of service: 10/07/2019. [11455713] [19-16650] (Burris, John) [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Appellant David Phillips motion to stay further action. Deficiencies: None. Served on 09/18/2019. [11436628] (CW) [Entered: 09/19/2019 06:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Appellants motions (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 4 ] & [ # 5 ]) to stay appellate proceedings and terminate attorneys Benjamin Nisenbaum, Esq., John L. Burris, Esq. and Lateef Hasani Gray, Esq. is denied without prejudice to filing a renewed motion which includes appellants current mailing address. See 9th Cir. R. 46-3. The previously established briefing schedule remains in place. [11430144] (OC) [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed non-party Latisha Williams document re: Motion for stay. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11423979] (RL) [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellants Chadrick Ingram, Delphine Norman and David Phillips pro se motion for stay. No service date. Deficiency: party has counsel. [11423971] (RL) [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/29/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11416036][19-16650] (AD) [Entered: 08/29/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Chadrick Ingram, K.T., Delphine Norman and David Phillips Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/29/2019. [11415781] [19-16650] (Burris, John) [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/30/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/20/2019. Transcript due 10/21/2019. Appellants Chadrick Ingram, K.T., Delphine Norman and David Phillips opening brief due 11/29/2019. Appellees City of Chico, Jared Cumber, Alex Fliehr and Jeremy Gagnebin answering brief due 12/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11407944] (JMR) [Entered: 08/23/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less