This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 06:04:10 (UTC).

David Meyers v. B. Dye

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 David Meyers filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against B Dye. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6313

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CLERK DUDLEY

S. SIMONS

A. MOORE

UNKNOWN NURSE

JOHNSON, Investigator

BALLOU

R. WALZ

S. YOUNG

C. CLINE

D. HAMMOND

FISCAL TECHNICIAN HELMANDOLLAR

S. YATES

DR. MCCARTHY

JAMES JONES

B. DYE

GLEN E. CONRAD

M. JONES

C. SMALLINGS

R. BISHOP

Plaintiff / Appellant

DAVID MEYERS

Big Stone Gap, VA 24219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Meyers

Attorney at WALLENS RIDGE STATE PRISON

P. O. Box 759

Big Stone Gap, VA 24219

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) COURT ORDER filed [1000500833] denying Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [4]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:43 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:18-cv-00557-MFU. Case manager: KStump. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:29 PM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ David Meyers ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:32 PM]

#3

(#3) PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:35 PM]

#6

(#6) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to David Meyers re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:44 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to David Meyers re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COURT ORDER filed [1000500833] denying Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [4]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 04/25/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#4) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by David Meyers. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ David Meyers ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: David Meyers. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:18-cv-00557-MFU. Case manager: KStump. [19-6313] KS [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.