This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 07:00:24 (UTC).

David Martincic, et al v. AO Smith Corp, et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 David Martincic filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AO Smith Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3068

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

AURORA PUMPS

BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES INC

SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL CO

SULZER PUMPS SOLUTIONS INC, FKA Ahlstrom Pumps LLC

EICHLEAY CORP

BEAZER EAST INC, in its own right and as Successor to Koppers, Co., and other related Companies, including Thiem Corporation, Beazer USA, ,Inc., and Beazer, PLC.

GARDNER DENVER INC

ATWOOD & MORRILL CO INC, DBA Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc

INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES INC

CARRIER CORP

REUNION INDUSTRIES INC

NASH ENGINEERING CO

ROBBINS & MYERS INC

FLOWSERVE UNITED STATES INC, solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company, FKA Flowserve FSD Corp, Successor to Valtek International

GREENE TWEED & CO

SUNDYNE LLC

SAUER INC

EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC, in its Own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan

FLSMIDTH INC, as successor-in-interest to Keeler-Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, FKA Fuller Co

MCWANE INC

155 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bridget L. Baranyai Esq.

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote

2578 Interstate Drive, Suite 105

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Ashley Waldinger Esq.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Francis J. Stanek Esq.

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

11 Grandview Circle, Suite 200

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Edward A. Smallwood Esq.

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

603 Stanwix Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Other Attorneys

Leif J. Ocheltree Esq.

Attorney at Goldberg Persky & White

11 Stanwix Street, Suite 1800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Gregory C. Scheuring Esq.

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Joseph L. Orszulak Esq. II

Attorney at Marks O'Neill O'Brien Doherty & Kelly

707 Grant Street, 2600 Gulf Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Robert L. Hogan Esq.

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Shannan N. Cerrone Esq.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Julie N. Friedman Esq.

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Philip P. Keating Esq.

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

11 Grandview Circle, Suite 200

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Nicholas J. Koch Esq.

Attorney at Burleson

1900 Main Street, Southpointe Town Center, Suite 201

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Kelly L. Smith Esq.

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

603 Stanwix Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Dennis R. McEwen Esq.

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor, Us Steel Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Aaron Arthur Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jason M. English Esq.

535 Smithfield Street, Oliver Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Alba E. Arriaga Esq.

Attorney at Riley & DeFalice

1001 Liberty Avenue, 1200 Liberty Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Daniel J. Sinclair Esq.

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor, Us Steel Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Michael J. Ross Esq.

Attorney at K&L Gates

210 Sixth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Patrick A. Hewitt Esq.

Attorney at Riley McNulty Hewitt & Sweitzer

650 Washington Road, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

81 #2

Standing Order Excess Pagination

81 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#80

(#80) ORDER (Clerk) advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal (JK) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:03 PM]

#79

(#79) LETTER filed by Kimberly A. Martin-O'Bryan on behalf of Appellee A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. takes no position on the Appeal.. (JK) [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:40 PM]

#78

(#78) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WT HRC Corp. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:02 PM]

#77

(#77) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Sundyne LLC. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:01 PM]

#76

(#76) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Simakas Co Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:00 PM]

#75

(#75) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Robinson Fans Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:59 PM]

#74

(#74) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Robbins & Myers Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:59 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:29 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of Appellant(s) Foster Wheeler, LLC. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:26 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:54 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order 10/01/2020

1 #2

District Court Memorandum 10/01/2020

#1

Civil Case Docketed

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC due on or before 03/22/2021. Appendix due on or before 03/22/2021. (JK) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ORDER (Clerk) advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal (JK) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) LETTER filed by Kimberly A. Martin-O'Bryan on behalf of Appellee A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. takes no position on the Appeal.. (JK) [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WT HRC Corp. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Sundyne LLC. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Simakas Co Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Robinson Fans Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Robbins & Myers Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Power Piping Co. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Moyno Inc. [20-3068] (GAH) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Edward A. Smallwood, Esq. for Appellees Ameron International Corp, Caterpillar Inc, Ingersoll Rand Corp, JM Foster Inc, Nash Engineering Co, Reunion Industries Inc, Wheeling Rubber Products Inc and William Powell Co List of defendants who take no position to the appeal of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC. Certificate of Service dated 10/28/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3068] (EAS) [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#9) District Court CM/ECF updated on 10/22/2020. Record complete for appeal purposes (JK) [Entered: 10/22/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1). No proceedings in District Court. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of Appellant(s) Foster Wheeler, LLC. [20-3068] (DFW) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Foster Wheeler LLC in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00958. (JK) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCWANE,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENE TWEED & CO is a litigant