This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/06/2022 at 05:27:02 (UTC).

David Marks v. UMG Recordings, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 David Marks filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UMG Recordings, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55453

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DAVID MARKS, an individual on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

UMG RECORDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation

CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Douglas L. Johnson Esquire

Attorney at JOHNSON & JOHNSON LLP

439 N. Canon Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Neville Johnson

Attorney at JOHNSON & JOHNSON LLP

439 N. Canon Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Matthew A. Pearson

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Bobby Pouya

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Daniel Leon Warshaw Esquire

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sean Ashley Commons Esquire

Attorney at Sidley Austin, LLP

555 W 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Lauren M. DeLilly

Attorney at Sidley Austin, LLP

555 W 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Rollin Ransom

Attorney at Sidley Austin, LLP

555 W 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant David Marks Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/11/2022. Appellant David Marks opening brief due 07/05/2022. Appellees Capitol Records, LLC and UMG Recordings, Inc. answering brief due 08/04/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12438378] (JBS) [Entered: 05/04/2022 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Ashley Commons Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rollin Ransom