This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2020 at 16:44:40 (UTC).

David Khan, et al v. Justin Rogers, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 David Khan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Justin Rogers. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15202

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

PINOLE POLICE DEPARTMENT

Plaintiff / Appellants

NAY ZAR TUN KYAW

Daly City, CA 94015

DAVID KHAN

Daly City, CA 94015

Defendant / Appellees

JUSTIN ROGERS, Sergeant

ERIC CASHER

CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

CITY OF PINOLE

NEIL H. GANG, Chief

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nay Zar Tun Kyaw

1453 Southgate Ave.

Daly City, CA 94015

David Khan

1453 Southgate Ave.

Daly City, CA 94015

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Noah G. Blechman Esquire

Attorney at McNamara, Ney, Beatty, Slattery, Borges & Ambacher, LLP

3480 Buskirk Avenue, Suite 250

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant David Khan letter dated 05/20/2020 re: Covid-19 extension request. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11697209] (CW) [Entered: 05/20/2020 04:02 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: EU): Updated deadlines. Automatic 60-day extension (notice filed at Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]). Appellants David Khan and Nay Zar Tun Kyaw opening brief due 07/20/2020. Appellees Eric Casher, City of Pinole, Contra Costa County, Neil H. Gang and Justin Rogers answering brief due 08/19/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11697537] (EU) [Entered: 05/21/2020 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant David Khan letter dated 05/20/2020 re: Covid-19 extension request. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11697209] (CW) [Entered: 05/20/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 03/10/2020. Transcript due 04/10/2020. Appellants David Khan and Nay Zar Tun Kyaw opening brief due 05/20/2020. Appellees Eric Casher, City of Pinole, Contra Costa County, Neil H. Gang and Justin Rogers answering brief due 06/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11594306] (RT) [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.