This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 06:01:06 (UTC).

David Hill v. FBI

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 David Hill filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against FBI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5156

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Federal Bureau of Investigation, (FBI)

Plaintiff / Appellant

David E. Hill

Florence, CO 81226-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Warden (Florence USP Ad Max)

Attorney at United States Penitentiary (Admin Maximum)

Po Box 8500

Florence, CO 81226-0000

David E. Hill

Attorney at Federal Transfer Center

Po Box 8500

Florence, CO 81226-0000

Warden (Oklahoma City)

Attorney at Federal Transfer Center

Po Box 898802

Oklahoma City, OK 73189-8802

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION [1798990] to extend time to file PLRA submission filed by David E. Hill [Service Date: 07/25/2019 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [19-5156] [Entered: 07/25/2019 12:20 PM]

Open Document

RECEIPT [1795540] received from David Hill [signed for on 06/03/2019] for documents [ # 1789695-2 ] sent to Appellant David E. Hill [19-5156] [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document #2

Document Sent

Open Document #1

Letter Sent

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1789694] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/29/2019. APPENDIX due 07/29/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document #5

Document Sent

Open Document #4

Form Sent

Open Document #3

Notice Sent

Open Document #2

Form Sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789676] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00704-UNA filed by David E. Hill. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5156. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1798990] to extend time to file PLRA submission filed by David E. Hill [Service Date: 07/25/2019 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [19-5156] [Entered: 07/25/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT [1795540] received from David Hill [signed for on 06/03/2019] for documents [ # 1789695-2 ] sent to Appellant David E. Hill [19-5156] [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1789695] sent to warden sending Clerk order order by warden letter [ # 1789694-4 ], sending Clerk order ifp prisoner submission [ # 1789686-3 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/27/2019. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1789694] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/29/2019. APPENDIX due 07/29/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1789686] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/27/2019; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 06/27/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789676] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00704-UNA filed by David E. Hill. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5156. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.