This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:30 (UTC).

David Bramlett v. Charles Ryan, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 David Bramlett filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Charles Ryan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16388

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF ARIZONA

CHARLES L. RYAN, named as Charles L. Ryan, et al.

Petitioner / Appellant

DAVID H. BRAMLETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Amy Thorson

Attorney at AGAZ- Office of the Arizona Attorney General

400 W. Congress

Tucson, AZ 85701-1367

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Adam N. Bleier

Attorney at Sherick & Bleier, PLLC

145 S. 6Th Avenue

Tucson, AZ 85701

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant David H. Bramlett Motion for certificate of appealability. Date of service: 08/14/2019. [11397359] [19-16388] (Bleier, Adam) [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:38 PM]

#1

(#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 07/01/2019. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11363231] (JMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:36 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant David H. Bramlett Correspondence: The correspondence pertains to an Application for a Certificate of Appealability.. Date of service: 07/16/2019 [11365636] [19-16388]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of correspondence 07/18/2019 by NAC] (Bleier, Adam) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:05 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant David H. Bramlett Motion for certificate of appealability. Date of service: 08/14/2019. [11397359] [19-16388] (Bleier, Adam) [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant David H. Bramlett Correspondence: The correspondence pertains to an Application for a Certificate of Appealability.. Date of service: 07/16/2019 [11365636] [19-16388]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of correspondence 07/18/2019 by NAC] (Bleier, Adam) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 07/01/2019. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11363231] (JMR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.