This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/05/2021 at 06:19:02 (UTC).

David Almendinger, et al v. 3M Company, et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 David Almendinger filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3238

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

David Almendinger

Blair Ashby

Steve Ballard

Boyd Barney

Justin Baxterragsdale

Alexander Beam

Gary Brown

Brian Bushman

Crystal Campbell

Colin Chandler

Brian Chapple

Richard Choate

John Civitello

Meljay Clapp

Matt Celmer

Phillip Couch

Carl Croon

Larry Davis

Richard Dearment

Luis Delgado

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew James Barber

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Alicia N. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

William R. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Amanda M. Williams

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Other Attorneys

Jerry Blackwell

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Benjamin Winters Hulse

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Andrew Crowder

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees David Almendinger, Blair Ashby, Steve Ballard, Boyd Barney, Justin Baxterragsdale, Alexander Beam, Gary Brown, Brian Bushman, Crystal Campbell, Matt Celmer, Colin Chandler, Brian Chapple, Richard Choate, John Civitello, Meljay Clapp, Phillip Couch, Carl Croon, Larry Davis, Richard Dearment, Luis Delgado, Curtis Devries, Jerry Dixon, Robert Eckel, Michael Faria, Dustin Fenlaw, Carlos Flynn, Paul Gaier, Lorance Garcia, Javier Garza, Danny Gordon, Marcus Gray, Michael Hanson, Stuart Herman, Perry Holmes, Steve Huff, Edward Huffine, Bradley Jacobs, Danny Justice, Patrick Kelley, Marsha Langlois, John Latham, Bradley Lauver, Howard Layton, Stephen Lipginski, Hector Lugo, Rogelio Maldonado, Artt Mann, Jerry Marinucci, Ignacio Martinez, Brandon Mccarty, Dennis Mcelmury, Jr., John Meghee, Thomas Meucci, Jose Neira, Phillip Nielssen, Hossep Ourjanian, Scott Palmer, Daniel Patterson, Cory Peltier, Wilfred Porras, Thomas Puente, Jesse Queck, Curtis Ritter, Ryan Root, Danny Sallad, Stephen Sedmak, Timothy Sersig, Garry Shook, Justin Snow, Alexander Snyder, Robert Suesakul, Corey Thomas, Britney Townsend, Jonathan Walters, Keith Whitcomb, Timothy Wiedrich, Ronnie Wilkerson, Stephen Yoda and Brian Yount w/service 10/08/2021 [5085515] [21-3238] (DEG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 02:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088109] [21-3238] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088113] [21-3238] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:21 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088121] [21-3238] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:24 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for remand, filed by Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees David Almendinger, Blair Ashby, Steve Ballard, Boyd Barney, Justin Baxterragsdale, Alexander Beam, Gary Brown, Brian Bushman, Crystal Campbell, Matt Celmer, Colin Chandler, Brian Chapple, Richard Choate, John Civitello, Meljay Clapp, Phillip Couch, Carl Croon, Larry Davis, Richard Dearment, Luis Delgado, Curtis Devries, Jerry Dixon, Robert Eckel, Michael Faria, Dustin Fenlaw, Carlos Flynn, Paul Gaier, Lorance Garcia, Javier Garza, Danny Gordon, Marcus Gray, Michael Hanson, Stuart Herman, Perry Holmes, Steve Huff, Edward Huffine, Bradley Jacobs, Danny Justice, Patrick Kelley, Marsha Langlois, John Latham, Bradley Lauver, Howard Layton, Stephen Lipginski, Hector Lugo, Rogelio Maldonado, Artt Mann, Jerry Marinucci, Ignacio Martinez, Brandon Mccarty, Dennis Mcelmury, Jr., John Meghee, Thomas Meucci, Jose Neira, Phillip Nielssen, Hossep Ourjanian, Scott Palmer, Daniel Patterson, Cory Peltier, Wilfred Porras, Thomas Puente, Jesse Queck, Curtis Ritter, Ryan Root, Danny Sallad, Stephen Sedmak, Timothy Sersig, Garry Shook, Justin Snow, Alexander Snyder, Robert Suesakul, Corey Thomas, Britney Townsend, Jonathan Walters, Keith Whitcomb, Timothy Wiedrich, Ronnie Wilkerson, Stephen Yoda and Brian Yount and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees David Almendinger, Blair Ashby, Steve Ballard, Boyd Barney, Justin Baxterragsdale, Alexander Beam, Gary Brown, Brian Bushman, Crystal Campbell, Matt Celmer, Colin Chandler, Brian Chapple, Richard Choate, John Civitello, Meljay Clapp, Phillip Couch, Carl Croon, Larry Davis, Richard Dearment, Luis Delgado, Curtis Devries, Jerry Dixon, Robert Eckel, Michael Faria, Dustin Fenlaw, Carlos Flynn, Paul Gaier, Lorance Garcia, Javier Garza, Danny Gordon, Marcus Gray, Michael Hanson, Stuart Herman, Perry Holmes, Steve Huff, Edward Huffine, Bradley Jacobs, Danny Justice, Patrick Kelley, Marsha Langlois, John Latham, Bradley Lauver, Howard Layton, Stephen Lipginski, Hector Lugo, Rogelio Maldonado, Artt Mann, Jerry Marinucci, Ignacio Martinez, Brandon Mccarty, Dennis Mcelmury, Jr., John Meghee, Thomas Meucci, Jose Neira, Phillip Nielssen, Hossep Ourjanian, Scott Palmer, Daniel Patterson, Cory Peltier, Wilfred Porras, Thomas Puente, Jesse Queck, Curtis Ritter, Ryan Root, Danny Sallad, Stephen Sedmak, Timothy Sersig, Garry Shook, Justin Snow, Alexander Snyder, Robert Suesakul, Corey Thomas, Britney Townsend, Jonathan Walters, Keith Whitcomb, Timothy Wiedrich, Ronnie Wilkerson, Stephen Yoda and Brian Yount in 21-3238, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Albert Lestenkof, Robert Lewis, Travis Pogue and Philip York and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Albert Lestenkof, Robert Lewis, Travis Pogue and Philip York in 21-3240, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Gage McClean-Coyer, Jonathan Rodriguez, Robert Torres and Joshua Weiss and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Gage McClean-Coyer, Jonathan Rodriguez, Robert Torres and Joshua Weiss in 21-3242, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellee Kevin Flansburg and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellee Kevin Flansburg in 21-3245, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Nathan Almquist, Phillip Anderson, Charles Anthony, Leotis Bell, Decoda Burris, James Chaffin, Edward Clayson, Charles Colegrove, Clayton Crawford, Dave Davis, Toby Davis, Cesar Diaz, Charla Geiman, Jonathan Gregoire, Justin Huggins, Isidro Hyatt, David Jones, Joshua Knowles, Joseph Lyles, Cole Nelson, Charles Osborne, Winston Paulk, Steven Perchak, Joseph Robertson, Michael Rowe, Zachary Rupp, James Snook, Nicholas Spivey, Jared Standley, Danny Trejo, James Tyson, Jimmie Williams, Charles Wilson and Lafretia Yeggins and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Nathan Almquist, Phillip Anderson, Charles Anthony, Leotis Bell, Decoda Burris, James Chaffin, Edward Clayson, Charles Colegrove, Clayton Crawford, Dave Davis, Toby Davis, Cesar Diaz, Charla Geiman, Jonathan Gregoire, Justin Huggins, Isidro Hyatt, David Jones, Joshua Knowles, Joseph Lyles, Cole Nelson, Charles Osborne, Winston Paulk, Steven Perchak, Joseph Robertson, Michael Rowe, Zachary Rupp, James Snook, Nicholas Spivey, Jared Standley, Danny Trejo, James Tyson, Jimmie Williams, Charles Wilson and Lafretia Yeggins in 21-3246, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Kimberly Ahrens, Jerry Anguiano, Martin Cisneros, Thomas Colvin, Douglas Goedert, Carlo Henao, Craig Hernandez, Osmanis Hernandez, Todd Jackson, Thomas Kessler, Wilbert Lee, Marco Padilla, Justin Staley, Richard Swartz, Paul Wonder and Kenneth Zepeda and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Kimberly Ahrens, Jerry Anguiano, Martin Cisneros, Thomas Colvin, Douglas Goedert, Carlo Henao, Craig Hernandez, Osmanis Hernandez, Todd Jackson, Thomas Kessler, Wilbert Lee, Marco Padilla, Justin Staley, Richard Swartz, Paul Wonder and Kenneth Zepeda in 21-3249, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Travis Kauffman and Steven Repp and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Travis Kauffman and Steven Repp in 21-3251 w/service 11/24/2021. [5101443] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251] (BWH) [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:52 AM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT FILED - The joint motion to remand the pending related appeals for further proceedings to the district court for proceedings consistent with the decision in Graves v. 3M Com., 2021 WL 4888617, at *7 (8th Cir. Oct. 20, 2021), [ # 5101443-2 ] has been considered and is granted. Remanded JAMES B. LOKEN, JANE KELLY and RALPH R. ERICKSON Adp Nov 2021 [5102408] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251] (NDG) [Entered: 11/29/2021 05:00 PM]

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED. [5102411] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251] (NDG) [Entered: 11/29/2021 05:03 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [5102411] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251] (NDG) [Entered: 11/29/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - The joint motion to remand the pending related appeals for further proceedings to the district court for proceedings consistent with the decision in Graves v. 3M Com., 2021 WL 4888617, at *7 (8th Cir. Oct. 20, 2021), [ # 5101443-2 ] has been considered and is granted. Remanded JAMES B. LOKEN, JANE KELLY and RALPH R. ERICKSON Adp Nov 2021 [5102408] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251] (NDG) [Entered: 11/29/2021 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges James B. Loken, Jane Kelly, Ralph R. Erickson in St. Louis [5102406] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251] (NDG) [Entered: 11/29/2021 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for remand, filed by Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees David Almendinger, Blair Ashby, Steve Ballard, Boyd Barney, Justin Baxterragsdale, Alexander Beam, Gary Brown, Brian Bushman, Crystal Campbell, Matt Celmer, Colin Chandler, Brian Chapple, Richard Choate, John Civitello, Meljay Clapp, Phillip Couch, Carl Croon, Larry Davis, Richard Dearment, Luis Delgado, Curtis Devries, Jerry Dixon, Robert Eckel, Michael Faria, Dustin Fenlaw, Carlos Flynn, Paul Gaier, Lorance Garcia, Javier Garza, Danny Gordon, Marcus Gray, Michael Hanson, Stuart Herman, Perry Holmes, Steve Huff, Edward Huffine, Bradley Jacobs, Danny Justice, Patrick Kelley, Marsha Langlois, John Latham, Bradley Lauver, Howard Layton, Stephen Lipginski, Hector Lugo, Rogelio Maldonado, Artt Mann, Jerry Marinucci, Ignacio Martinez, Brandon Mccarty, Dennis Mcelmury, Jr., John Meghee, Thomas Meucci, Jose Neira, Phillip Nielssen, Hossep Ourjanian, Scott Palmer, Daniel Patterson, Cory Peltier, Wilfred Porras, Thomas Puente, Jesse Queck, Curtis Ritter, Ryan Root, Danny Sallad, Stephen Sedmak, Timothy Sersig, Garry Shook, Justin Snow, Alexander Snyder, Robert Suesakul, Corey Thomas, Britney Townsend, Jonathan Walters, Keith Whitcomb, Timothy Wiedrich, Ronnie Wilkerson, Stephen Yoda and Brian Yount and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees David Almendinger, Blair Ashby, Steve Ballard, Boyd Barney, Justin Baxterragsdale, Alexander Beam, Gary Brown, Brian Bushman, Crystal Campbell, Matt Celmer, Colin Chandler, Brian Chapple, Richard Choate, John Civitello, Meljay Clapp, Phillip Couch, Carl Croon, Larry Davis, Richard Dearment, Luis Delgado, Curtis Devries, Jerry Dixon, Robert Eckel, Michael Faria, Dustin Fenlaw, Carlos Flynn, Paul Gaier, Lorance Garcia, Javier Garza, Danny Gordon, Marcus Gray, Michael Hanson, Stuart Herman, Perry Holmes, Steve Huff, Edward Huffine, Bradley Jacobs, Danny Justice, Patrick Kelley, Marsha Langlois, John Latham, Bradley Lauver, Howard Layton, Stephen Lipginski, Hector Lugo, Rogelio Maldonado, Artt Mann, Jerry Marinucci, Ignacio Martinez, Brandon Mccarty, Dennis Mcelmury, Jr., John Meghee, Thomas Meucci, Jose Neira, Phillip Nielssen, Hossep Ourjanian, Scott Palmer, Daniel Patterson, Cory Peltier, Wilfred Porras, Thomas Puente, Jesse Queck, Curtis Ritter, Ryan Root, Danny Sallad, Stephen Sedmak, Timothy Sersig, Garry Shook, Justin Snow, Alexander Snyder, Robert Suesakul, Corey Thomas, Britney Townsend, Jonathan Walters, Keith Whitcomb, Timothy Wiedrich, Ronnie Wilkerson, Stephen Yoda and Brian Yount in 21-3238, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Albert Lestenkof, Robert Lewis, Travis Pogue and Philip York and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Albert Lestenkof, Robert Lewis, Travis Pogue and Philip York in 21-3240, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Gage McClean-Coyer, Jonathan Rodriguez, Robert Torres and Joshua Weiss and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Gage McClean-Coyer, Jonathan Rodriguez, Robert Torres and Joshua Weiss in 21-3242, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellee Kevin Flansburg and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellee Kevin Flansburg in 21-3245, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Nathan Almquist, Phillip Anderson, Charles Anthony, Leotis Bell, Decoda Burris, James Chaffin, Edward Clayson, Charles Colegrove, Clayton Crawford, Dave Davis, Toby Davis, Cesar Diaz, Charla Geiman, Jonathan Gregoire, Justin Huggins, Isidro Hyatt, David Jones, Joshua Knowles, Joseph Lyles, Cole Nelson, Charles Osborne, Winston Paulk, Steven Perchak, Joseph Robertson, Michael Rowe, Zachary Rupp, James Snook, Nicholas Spivey, Jared Standley, Danny Trejo, James Tyson, Jimmie Williams, Charles Wilson and Lafretia Yeggins and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Nathan Almquist, Phillip Anderson, Charles Anthony, Leotis Bell, Decoda Burris, James Chaffin, Edward Clayson, Charles Colegrove, Clayton Crawford, Dave Davis, Toby Davis, Cesar Diaz, Charla Geiman, Jonathan Gregoire, Justin Huggins, Isidro Hyatt, David Jones, Joshua Knowles, Joseph Lyles, Cole Nelson, Charles Osborne, Winston Paulk, Steven Perchak, Joseph Robertson, Michael Rowe, Zachary Rupp, James Snook, Nicholas Spivey, Jared Standley, Danny Trejo, James Tyson, Jimmie Williams, Charles Wilson and Lafretia Yeggins in 21-3246, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Kimberly Ahrens, Jerry Anguiano, Martin Cisneros, Thomas Colvin, Douglas Goedert, Carlo Henao, Craig Hernandez, Osmanis Hernandez, Todd Jackson, Thomas Kessler, Wilbert Lee, Marco Padilla, Justin Staley, Richard Swartz, Paul Wonder and Kenneth Zepeda and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Kimberly Ahrens, Jerry Anguiano, Martin Cisneros, Thomas Colvin, Douglas Goedert, Carlo Henao, Craig Hernandez, Osmanis Hernandez, Todd Jackson, Thomas Kessler, Wilbert Lee, Marco Padilla, Justin Staley, Richard Swartz, Paul Wonder and Kenneth Zepeda in 21-3249, Mr. Jerry Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC, Mr. Benjamin Winters Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC and Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Travis Kauffman and Steven Repp and Ms. Amanda M. Williams for Appellees Travis Kauffman and Steven Repp in 21-3251 w/service 11/24/2021. [5101443] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251] (BWH) [Entered: 11/24/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088121] [21-3238] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088113] [21-3238] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088109] [21-3238] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees David Almendinger, Blair Ashby, Steve Ballard, Boyd Barney, Justin Baxterragsdale, Alexander Beam, Gary Brown, Brian Bushman, Crystal Campbell, Matt Celmer, Colin Chandler, Brian Chapple, Richard Choate, John Civitello, Meljay Clapp, Phillip Couch, Carl Croon, Larry Davis, Richard Dearment, Luis Delgado, Curtis Devries, Jerry Dixon, Robert Eckel, Michael Faria, Dustin Fenlaw, Carlos Flynn, Paul Gaier, Lorance Garcia, Javier Garza, Danny Gordon, Marcus Gray, Michael Hanson, Stuart Herman, Perry Holmes, Steve Huff, Edward Huffine, Bradley Jacobs, Danny Justice, Patrick Kelley, Marsha Langlois, John Latham, Bradley Lauver, Howard Layton, Stephen Lipginski, Hector Lugo, Rogelio Maldonado, Artt Mann, Jerry Marinucci, Ignacio Martinez, Brandon Mccarty, Dennis Mcelmury, Jr., John Meghee, Thomas Meucci, Jose Neira, Phillip Nielssen, Hossep Ourjanian, Scott Palmer, Daniel Patterson, Cory Peltier, Wilfred Porras, Thomas Puente, Jesse Queck, Curtis Ritter, Ryan Root, Danny Sallad, Stephen Sedmak, Timothy Sersig, Garry Shook, Justin Snow, Alexander Snyder, Robert Suesakul, Corey Thomas, Britney Townsend, Jonathan Walters, Keith Whitcomb, Timothy Wiedrich, Ronnie Wilkerson, Stephen Yoda and Brian Yount w/service 10/08/2021 [5085515] [21-3238] (DEG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent to hold case in abeyance. [5085346] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251, 21-3252] (MMH) [Entered: 10/08/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 11/16/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 11/16/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5085094] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251, 21-3252] (MMH) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 9/21/21 [5084689] [21-3238] (MMH) [Entered: 10/06/2021 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5084679] [21-3238] (MMH) [Entered: 10/06/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin W Hulse