Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 06:01:25 (UTC).

Dave Dixon v. Select Portfolio Servicing Co.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Dave Dixon filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1239

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HSBC BANK USA, N.A., C/O The Corporation Trust Incorporated

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING COMPANY, C/O Lawyers Incorporating Service Company

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., C/O Sharon Horstkamp

Plaintiff / Appellants

JULIANA K. DIXON

Ellicott City, MD 21042

DAVE L. DIXON

Ellicott City, MD 21042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Daniel A. Glass

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS CHERIN & MELLOTT, LLC

1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Juliana K. Dixon

10013 Old Frederick Road

Ellicott City, MD 21042

Dave L. Dixon

10013 Old Frederick Road

Ellicott City, MD 21042

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Select Portfolio Servicing Company. [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 04/09/2020 04:07 PM]

#9

(#9) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 04/09/2020. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:44 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dave L. Dixon and Juliana K. Dixon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000710162] [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:42 PM]

#7

(#7) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Dave L. Dixon and Juliana K. Dixon. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:39 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702938] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:54 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702937] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:53 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702936] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:53 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel A. Glass for HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Select Portfolio Servicing Company. [1000702932] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:52 PM]

#2

Disclosure form

2 #1

Informal briefing order

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01710-DKC. Case manager: AWalker. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/02/2020 08:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Select Portfolio Servicing Company. [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 04/09/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#10) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01710-DKC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 04/09/2020. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dave L. Dixon and Juliana K. Dixon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000710162] [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Dave L. Dixon and Juliana K. Dixon. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702938] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702937] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000702936] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel A. Glass for HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Select Portfolio Servicing Company. [1000702932] [20-1239] Daniel Glass [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Dave L. Dixon, Juliana K. Dixon. Informal Opening Brief due 03/26/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/02/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01710-DKC. Case manager: AWalker. [20-1239] AW [Entered: 03/02/2020 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant