This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/10/2020 at 06:01:17 (UTC).

Davalloo v. Kaplan

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Davalloo filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Kaplan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3087

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

Sabina Kaplan, Superintendent, Bedford Hills Correctional Facility

George Jepsen, Attorney General of the State of Connecticut

Petitioner / Appellant

Sheila Davalloo

Bedford Hills, NY 10507-2499

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Barbara D. Underwood

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Michelle E. Maerov

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

JoAnne Sulik Esq.

Attorney at Connecticut Office of the Chief State's Attorney

300 Corporate Place

Rocky Hill, CT 06067

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Sheila Davalloo

Attorney at Bedford Hills Correctional Facility

P.O. Box 1000

Bedford Hills, NY 10507-2499

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) PAPERS, Copy of Acknowledgment and notice of Appearance, RECEIVED.[2949448] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/09/2020 02:56 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER, dated 09/29/2020, dismissing appeal by 10/20/2020 unless Appellant Sheila Davalloo, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2940271] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/29/2020 05:08 AM]

#17

(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944900] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:45 AM]

#18

(#18) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944902] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:46 AM]

#16

(#16) MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944893] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:43 AM]

#15

(#15) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944874] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:34 AM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sabina Kaplan, FILED. Service date 09/18/2020 by US mail. [2933865] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:08 AM]

#9

(#9) DISTRICT COURT ORDER denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability, dated 09/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2930536] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:23 PM]

#8

(#8) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2929383] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:39 PM]

#7

(#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for certificate of appealability, [6], on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED.[2929371] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:34 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/31/2020, RECEIVED.[2929354] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:25 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT RULING, denying certificate of appealability, dated 08/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2929353] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:24 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PAPERS, Copy of Acknowledgment and notice of Appearance, RECEIVED.[2949448] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/09/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, for certificate of appealability [ # 7 ], [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED.[2944916] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE, to Appellee George Jepsen , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2940272] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/29/2020 05:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER, dated 09/29/2020, dismissing appeal by 10/20/2020 unless Appellant Sheila Davalloo, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2940271] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/29/2020 05:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944900] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944902] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944893] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2944874] [20-3087] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Michelle Maerov, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2935379] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sabina Kaplan, FILED. Service date 09/18/2020 by US mail. [2933865] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISTRICT COURT ORDER denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability, dated 09/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2930536] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2929383] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for certificate of appealability, [6], on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED.[2929371] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#6) MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. No Service.[2929363] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2929360] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/31/2020, RECEIVED.[2929354] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT RULING, denying certificate of appealability, dated 08/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2929353] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sheila Davalloo, FILED. [2929345] [20-3087] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less