This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/21/2019 at 06:05:30 (UTC).

Data Scape Limited v. Western Digital Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Data Scape Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Western Digital Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2161

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DATA SCAPE LIMITED

Defendant / Appellees

WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION

WESTERN DIGITAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc Aaron Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gregory S. Cordrey

Attorney at Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Mitchell, LLP

3 Park Plaza, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Stanley Martin Gibson Esq.

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Floor 7

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Appellant's opening brief [ # 18 ] filed by Appellant Data Scape Limited. The opening brief is due 10/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [635438] [TAM] [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION of Appellant Data Scape Limited to extend the time to 10/07/2019 to file the Appellant's Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/13/2019 by email. [635399] [19-2161] [Paul Kroeger] [Entered: 09/13/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellant Data Scape Limited. Service: 08/07/2019 by email. [626718] [19-2161] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corrected Entry of appearance for Stanley M. Gibson as principal counsel for Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/07/2019 by email. [626702] [19-2161] [Stanley Gibson] [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corrected Entry of appearance for Gregory S. Cordrey as of counsel for Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/07/2019 by email. [626700] [19-2161] [Gregory Cordrey] [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/07/2019 by email. [626698] [19-2161] [Gregory Cordrey] [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Data Scape Limited, Certificate of Interest [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [626553] [TAM] [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Entry of Appearance for Stanley M. Gibson, Gregory s. Cordrey, and the Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 08/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [626550] [TAM] [Entered: 08/07/2019 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Reza Mirzaie as of counsel for Appellant Data Scape Limited. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626523] [19-2161] [Reza Mirzaie] [Entered: 08/06/2019 07:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Paul A. Kroeger as of counsel for Appellant Data Scape Limited. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626522] [19-2161] [Paul Kroeger] [Entered: 08/06/2019 07:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for Marc A. Fenster as principal counsel for Appellant Data Scape Limited. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626521] [19-2161] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/06/2019 07:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Data Scape Limited. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626520] [19-2161] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 13 ] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/06/2019 07:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Data Scape Limited. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626519] [19-2161] [Marc Fenster] [Entered: 08/06/2019 07:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Stanley M. Gibson as principal counsel for Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626511] [19-2161] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Stanley Gibson] [Entered: 08/06/2019 07:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626490] [19-2161] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Gregory Cordrey] [Entered: 08/06/2019 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626487] [19-2161] [Gregory Cordrey] [Entered: 08/06/2019 05:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Gregory S. Cordrey as of counsel for Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626486] [19-2161] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Gregory Cordrey] [Entered: 08/06/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Stanley M. Gibson as principal counsel for Appellees Western Digital Corporation and Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/06/2019 by email. [626485] [19-2161] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Gregory Cordrey] [Entered: 08/06/2019 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/15/2019. [622869] Entry of Appearance due 08/06/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/06/2019. Docketing Statement due 08/06/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/23/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Digital Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Data Scape Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Digital Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory S. Cordrey