This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/24/2019 at 06:12:13 (UTC).

Data Scape Limited v. Pandora Media, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Data Scape Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Pandora Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1080

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DATA SCAPE LIMITED

Defendant / Appellee

PANDORA MEDIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Bryan Alexander Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 2 ] filed by Appellant Data Scape Limited.; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [645730] [TAM] [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION of Appellant Data Scape Limited to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645671] [20-1080] [Paul Kroeger] [Entered: 10/29/2019 07:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/17/2019. [644653] Entry of Appearance due 11/08/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/08/2019. Docketing Statement due 11/08/2019. Appellant's brief is due 12/24/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 10/25/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pandora Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Data Scape Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan Alexander Kohm