This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 06:11:39 (UTC).

Darryl Dunsmore v. Gore

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Darryl Dunsmore filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Gore. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56226

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DARRYL LEE DUNSMORE

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent / Appellee

GORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Darryl Lee Dunsmore

Attorney at SDCJ - SAN DIEGO CENTRAL JAIL

1173 Front St.

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 12/03/2020. Denying COA [11925115] (RR) [Entered: 12/11/2020 04:56 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The district court has not issued or declined to issue a certificate of appealability in this appeal, which appears to arise under 28 U.S.C. 2254. This case is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of granting or denying a certificate of appealability at the courts earliest convenience. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c); Fed. R. App. P. 22(b); United States v. Asrar, 116 F.3d 1268, 1270 (9th Cir. 1997). If the district court issues a certificate of appealability, the court should specify which issue or issues meet the required showing. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(3); Asrar, 116 F.3d at 1270. Under Asrar, if the district court declines to issue a certificate, the court should state its reasons why a certificate of appealability should not be granted, and the Clerk of the district court shall forward to this court the record with the order denying the certificate. See Asrar, 116 F.3d at 1270. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the district court. (Pro Se) [11909500] (CKP) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:01 PM]

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 12/03/2020. Denying COA [11925115] (RR) [Entered: 12/11/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The district court has not issued or declined to issue a certificate of appealability in this appeal, which appears to arise under 28 U.S.C. 2254. This case is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of granting or denying a certificate of appealability at the courts earliest convenience. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c); Fed. R. App. P. 22(b); United States v. Asrar, 116 F.3d 1268, 1270 (9th Cir. 1997). If the district court issues a certificate of appealability, the court should specify which issue or issues meet the required showing. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(3); Asrar, 116 F.3d at 1270. Under Asrar, if the district court declines to issue a certificate, the court should state its reasons why a certificate of appealability should not be granted, and the Clerk of the district court shall forward to this court the record with the order denying the certificate. See Asrar, 116 F.3d at 1270. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the district court. (Pro Se) [11909500] (CKP) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Open 9th Circuit docket. No COA order in district court. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11901728] (OC) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gore is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darryl Lee Dunsmore