This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 06:06:17 (UTC).

Darren Henderson v. J. Lewis, et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Darren Henderson against J Lewis in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16958

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

KIM KUMAR

B. MARSHALL

W. L. MUNIZ

Defendant / Appellees

J. RODRIGUEZ, LVN

L. GAMBOA, M.D.

J. LEWIS

K. KUMAR

C. WATSON

Plaintiff / Appellant

DARREN HENDERSON

Represa, CA 95671-0066

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Nasstaran Ruhparwar

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Darren Henderson

Attorney at CSP - CALIFORNIA STATE PRISON (SACRAMENTO)

P.O. Box 290066

Represa, CA 95671-0066

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Declaration in Support of Response to Plaintiff-Appellant's Statement with Exhib

14 #1

Response to Plaintiff-Appellant's Statement that His Appeal Should Go Forward

#13

(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellees L. Gamboa, M.D., C. Watson, J. Rodriguez, J. Lewis and K. Kumar Motion to extend time to file a response until 12/02/2019. Date of service: 11/12/2019. [11495882] [19-16958] (Ruhparwar, Nasstaran) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:40 AM]

#12

(#12) Filed Appellant Darren Henderson statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 10/29/2019. [11493061] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:48 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed Appellant Darren Henderson FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/29/2019. [11493054] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:47 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed Appellant Darren Henderson FORM 24 motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/17/2019. [11471969] (RL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:03 PM]

8 #4

Additional Document

8 #3

Additional Document

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/10/2019 ORDER denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re: Dkt. No. 67. [11460935] (RL) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:40 PM]

#5

(#5) Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/07/2019 ORDER denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re: Dkt. No. 63. [11460932] (RL) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:38 PM]

#4

(#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11459640] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:19 PM]

1 #3

Pro Se Appeal Case Information Packet

1 #2

Counsel Appeal Case Information Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Filed (ECF) Appellees L. Gamboa, M.D., C. Watson, J. Rodriguez, J. Lewis and K. Kumar reply to response to Court order dated 10/16/2019. Date of service: 11/26/2019. [11513878] [19-16958] (Ruhparwar, Nasstaran) [Entered: 11/26/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Filed (ECF) Appellees L. Gamboa, M.D., C. Watson, J. Rodriguez, J. Lewis and K. Kumar Motion to extend time to file a response until 12/02/2019. Date of service: 11/12/2019. [11495882] [19-16958] (Ruhparwar, Nasstaran) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Filed Appellant Darren Henderson statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 10/29/2019. [11493061] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed Appellant Darren Henderson FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/29/2019. [11493054] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 10/15/2019. [Case Number 19-16958: Partially Paid] [11474966] (RL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed Appellant Darren Henderson FORM 24 motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/17/2019. [11471969] (RL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that on October 7, 2019, the district court denied appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal because it found that the appeal was frivolous. Accordingly, this courts October 9, 2019 order directing appellant to sign and return the prisoner authorization form to this court is vacated [ # 4 ]. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If the court dismisses the appeal as frivolous, this appeal may be counted as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellee may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk will serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11466518] (CKP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • (#7) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 19-16958: Due] ). [11461895] (CO) [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/10/2019 ORDER denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re: Dkt. No. 67. [11460935] (RL) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/07/2019 ORDER denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re: Dkt. No. 63. [11460932] (RL) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11459640] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • (#3) Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11459501] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • (#2) Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11459241] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Darren Henderson opening brief due 12/02/2019. Appellees L. Gamboa, K. Kumar, J. Lewis, J. Rodriguez and C. Watson answering brief due 01/02/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11454047] (HC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.