This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:28:00 (UTC).

Darren Bottinelli, et al v. Josias Salazar, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 Darren Bottinelli filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Josias Salazar. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35201

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

JOSIAS SALAZAR

WILLIAM BROWN

Petitioner / Appellants

JUAN JESUS BORREGO

MARK NUTTER

ALEX DURAND WILLIAMS-DAVIS

PAMELA MARIE MCGOWAN

MICHAEL EUGENE DAVIS

DARREN BOTTINELLI

TIMOTHY LASHAWN ALLEN

RICARDO CESAR RAMIREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Jared Hager

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Kelly A. Zusman

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Stephen R. Sady

Attorney at FPDOR - Federal Public Defender's Office

101 S.W. Main Street

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN and MARY H. MURGUIA): The unopposed motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted in part. The opening brief has been filed. The answering brief is due April 25, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 10 days after service of the answering brief. The Clerk shall place this case on the July 2019 oral argument calendar in Portland. See 9th Cir. Gen. Ord. 3.3(f). [11247878] (AF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 09:47 AM]

#15

(#15) Sent letter to Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez, Alex Durand Williams-Davis and Appellees William Brown and Josias Salazar re: Notice of Related Cases. [11280226] (AKM) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:59 AM]

#19

(#19) Filed (ECF) Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 05/13/2019. Date of service: 05/06/2019. [11287946] [19-35201] (Sady, Stephen) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:34 PM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#7

(#7) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 4 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 5 ] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11243179] (LA) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:53 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

12 #1

Main Document

12 #2

Addendum

#13

(#13) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 12 ] submitted by William Brown and Josias Salazar is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11277750] (SML) [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:40 PM]

#6

(#8) Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN and MARY H. MURGUIA): The unopposed motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted in part. The opening brief has been filed. The answering brief is due April 25, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 10 days after service of the answering brief. The Clerk shall place this case on the July 2019 oral argument calendar in Portland. See 9th Cir. Gen. Ord. 3.3(f). [11247878] (AF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 09:47 AM]

5 #1

ER Vol 1

#4

(#10) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 4 ] filed by appellants. [11248721] (SD) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:20 PM]

5 #2

ER Vol 2

#21

(#21) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Appellants unopposed motion to extend the time for filing a reply brief to May 13, 2019 (Dkt. No. [ # 19 ]) is GRANTED. [11290259] (AF) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:07 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Appellants unopposed motion to extend the time for filing a reply brief to May 13, 2019 (Dkt. No. [ # 19 ]) is GRANTED. [11290259] (AF) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • (#20) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Stephen R. Sady for Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis. Hearing in Portland on 07/08/2019 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: 2nd Floor Courtroom). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 05/06/2019. [11287971] [19-35201] (Sady, Stephen) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Filed (ECF) Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 05/13/2019. Date of service: 05/06/2019. [11287946] [19-35201] (Sady, Stephen) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • (#18) Streamlined request [17] by Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis to extend time to file the brief is not approved because extension is not allowed pursuant to CR 31-2.2(a)(2) because the case has been scheduled for argument on 07/08/2019. [11287213] (DLM) [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • (#17) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis. New requested due date is 05/20/2019. [11286687] [19-35201] (Sady, Stephen) [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 12 ] filed by William Brown and Josias Salazar. (sent to panel) [11280809] (SD) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Sent letter to Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez, Alex Durand Williams-Davis and Appellees William Brown and Josias Salazar re: Notice of Related Cases. [11280226] (AKM) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2019
  • (#14) Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, July 8, 2019 - 09:00 A.M. - PO 2nd Floor Ctrm - Portland OR. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Monday, July 8, 2019. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[11279692] (AW) [Entered: 04/28/2019 06:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 12 ] submitted by William Brown and Josias Salazar is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11277750] (SML) [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Josias Salazar and William Brown. Date of service: 04/25/2019. [11277714] [19-35201] (Hager, Jared) [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 4 ] filed by appellants. [11248721] (SD) [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • (#9) This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in Portland. Please review the Portland sitting dates for July 2019 at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please file # Form 32 immediately using the CM/ECF filing type Response to Case Being Considered for Oral Argument . Please follow the form's # instructions carefully. When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter immediately , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation). [11248048] (AKM) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN and MARY H. MURGUIA): The unopposed motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted in part. The opening brief has been filed. The answering brief is due April 25, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 10 days after service of the answering brief. The Clerk shall place this case on the July 2019 oral argument calendar in Portland. See 9th Cir. Gen. Ord. 3.3(f). [11247878] (AF) [Entered: 04/01/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 4 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 5 ] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11243179] (LA) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis Unopposed Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 03/25/2019. [11241750] [19-35201] (Sady, Stephen) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis. Date of service: 03/25/2019. [11241742] [19-35201] (Sady, Stephen) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis. Date of service: 03/25/2019. [11241739] [19-35201] (Sady, Stephen) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#3) Added attorney Kelly A. Zusman for appellees Josias Salazar and William Brown, in case 19-35201. [11236401] (HH) [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kelly A. Zusman for Appellees Josias Salazar and William Brown. Date of service: 03/20/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11236285] [19-35201] (Zusman, Kelly) [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 04/12/2019. Transcript due 05/13/2019. Appellants Timothy Lashawn Allen, Juan Jesus Borrego, Darren Bottinelli, Michael Eugene Davis, Pamela Marie McGowan, Mark Nutter, Ricardo Cesar Ramirez and Alex Durand Williams-Davis opening brief due 06/21/2019. Appellees William Brown and Josias Salazar answering brief due 07/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11227964] (RT) [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.