This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/26/2022 at 06:15:20 (UTC).

Darrell Younger v. Warden

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 Darrell Younger filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10276

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DARRELL EUGENE YOUNGER

Waycross, GA 31503-0311

Respondent / Appellee

WARDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Darrell Eugene Younger

Attorney at Ware SP - Inmate Legal Mail

3620 N Harris Rd

Waycross, GA 31503-0311

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew Crowder

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Christopher Michael Carr

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula Khristian Smith

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

HAB-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Order Appealed DE# 21

Open Document #4

DC Judgment Appealed DE# 22

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger was filed on 12/08/2021. Docket Entry 21. [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:33 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Crowder for Warden. [22-10276] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 02/01/2022 12:33 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew Crowder for Appellee Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10276] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:52 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger. [Entered: 02/23/2022 09:29 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9604110-1] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:42 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9604123-1] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:45 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger [ # 9604110-2 ] filed by Attorney Matthew Crowder for Appellee Warden. [22-10276] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:08 AM]

Open Document #1

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Darrell Eugene Younger. [Entered: 03/19/2022 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger [ # 9604110-2 ] filed by Attorney Matthew Crowder for Appellee Warden. [22-10276] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9604123-1] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9604110-1] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger. [Entered: 02/23/2022 09:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew Crowder for Appellee Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10276] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Crowder for Warden. [22-10276] (ECF: Matthew Crowder) [Entered: 02/01/2022 12:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying COA as to Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger was filed on 12/08/2021. Docket Entry 21. [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Darrell Eugene Younger on 01/24/2022. Fee Status: IFP Granted. [Entered: 01/28/2022 05:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Blackwell Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Michael Carr