This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 17:53:50 (UTC).

Darrell Connor v. Covil Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Darrell Connor filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Covil Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1015

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

DANA COMPANIES, LLC, SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WARNER BRAKE AND CLUTCH COMPANY, INC

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF EMERSON ELECTRIC COMPANY

PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ABEX CORPORATION

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED

CBS CORPORATION, agent of VIACOM, INC., SUED AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation

CARRIER CORPORATION

MINE SAFETY APPLICANCES COMPANY, LLC

FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.

FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION

BW/IP, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMPS

CRANE CO

WARNER ELECTRIC LLC

FLOWSERVE US, INC., individually and as successor to BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

Defendant / Appellees

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc.

COVIL CORPORATION

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Denny Parker Major

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

Scott Edward Frick

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

William David Conner

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

Moffatt Grier McDonald

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH, SINKLER & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

William Walton Silverman

Attorney at WALL TEMPLETON & HALDRUP, PA

1001 Wade Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27605

Keith E. Coltrain

Attorney at WALL TEMPLETON & HALDRUP, PA

1001 Wade Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27605

Mark H. Wall

Attorney at WALL TEMPLETON & HALDRUP, PA

P. O. Box 1200

Charleston, SC 29401-1200

Morgan Stuart Templeton Esq.

Attorney at WALL TEMPLETON & HALDRUP, PA

P. O. Box 1200

Charleston, SC 29401-1200

Other Attorneys

Lisa White Shirley

Attorney at DEAN OMAR BRANHAM SHIRLEY, LLP

302 North Market Street

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER filed [1000464590] withdrawing/relieving/substituting counsel; administratively terminating Motion to withdraw [ # 19 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:36 AM]

#19

(#19) MOTION by Covil Corporation to withdraw as Counsel... Date and method of service: 02/25/2019 ecf. [1000464461] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:58 PM]

#18

(#18) ORDER filed [1000463757] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 04/10/2019. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 04/10/2019. Response brief due 05/10/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1015] TW [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:20 AM]

#17

(#17) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Keith E. Coltrain for Covil Corporation. [1000459780] [19-1015] Keith Coltrain [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:01 AM]

#16

(#16) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1015] LP [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:14 PM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark H. Wall for Covil Corporation. [1000448362] [19-1015] Mark Wall [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:19 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Morgan S. Templeton for Covil Corporation. [1000448317] [19-1015] Morgan Templeton [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:25 PM]

#13

(#13) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2019. Response Brief due 04/10/2019. [19-1015] TW [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:39 AM]

#12

(#12) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Darrell A. Connor. [19-1015] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:16 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Denny P. Major for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441762] [19-1015] Denny Major [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:31 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott E. Frick for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441749] [19-1015] Scott Frick [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:12 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Daniel International Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000441087] [19-1015] Moffatt McDonald [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:22 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William David Conner for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441080] [19-1015] William Conner [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:17 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Moffatt G. McDonald for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441078] [19-1015] Moffatt McDonald [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:15 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Covil Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000433159] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:03 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William W. Silverman for Covil Corporation. [1000433157] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:02 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00127-LCB-JLW. Mailed to: Benjamin D. Braly, Charles W. Branham III, William Marc Graham, Sabrina G. Stone. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:51 AM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00127-LCB-JLW. Mailed to: Benjamin D. Braly, Charles W. Branham III, William Marc Graham, Sabrina G. Stone. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:51 AM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER filed [1000464590] withdrawing/relieving/substituting counsel; administratively terminating Motion to withdraw [ # 19 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION by Covil Corporation to withdraw as Counsel... Date and method of service: 02/25/2019 ecf. [1000464461] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER filed [1000463757] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 04/10/2019. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 04/10/2019. Response brief due 05/10/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1015] TW [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Keith E. Coltrain for Covil Corporation. [1000459780] [19-1015] Keith Coltrain [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1015] LP [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark H. Wall for Covil Corporation. [1000448362] [19-1015] Mark Wall [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Morgan S. Templeton for Covil Corporation. [1000448317] [19-1015] Morgan Templeton [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2019. Response Brief due 04/10/2019. [19-1015] TW [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Darrell A. Connor. [19-1015] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Darrell A. Connor. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000447310] [19-1015] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa W. Shirley for Darrell A. Connor. [1000447308] [19-1015] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Denny P. Major for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441762] [19-1015] Denny Major [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott E. Frick for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441749] [19-1015] Scott Frick [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Daniel International Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000441087] [19-1015] Moffatt McDonald [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William David Conner for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441080] [19-1015] William Conner [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Moffatt G. McDonald for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441078] [19-1015] Moffatt McDonald [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Covil Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000433159] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William W. Silverman for Covil Corporation. [1000433157] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00127-LCB-JLW. Mailed to: Benjamin D. Braly, Charles W. Branham III, William Marc Graham, Sabrina G. Stone. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00127-LCB-JLW. Case manager: JRice. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINE SAFETY APPLICANCES COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant