This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/12/2022 at 06:04:00 (UTC).

Darlene Gibbs v. Haynes Investments, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 Darlene Gibbs filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Haynes Investments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1434

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendants

SCOTT ZEMNICK

VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC

THOMAS E. WELCH

JEFFREY SCHNEIDER

VICTORY PARK MANAGEMENT, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellees

DARLENE GIBBS

PATRICK INSCHO

LAWRENCE MWETHUKU, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated

STEPHANIE EDWARDS

LULA WILLIAMS

Defendant / Appellants

HAYNES INVESTMENTS, LLC

SOVEREIGN BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC

L. STEPHEN HAYNES

Amicus Curiae

NATIVE AMERICAN FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan Alan Fratkin

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Aaron Harvey Marks

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN, LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-0000

Ashley P. Peterson

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

James Wilson Speer

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Elizabeth W. Hanes

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Leonard Anthony Bennett

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Craig Carley Marchiando

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Matthew W. H. Wessler

Attorney at GUPTA WESSLER PLLC

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jonathan Peter Boughrum

1735 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David Foster Herman

1735 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

P. O. Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23218-1122

David Foster Herman Esq.

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE, LLP

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Richard L. Scheff

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE, LLP

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Timothy James St. George

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

P. O. Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23218-1122

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Patrick O. Daugherty

Attorney at VAN NESS FELDMAN LLP

1050 Thomas Jefferson Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20007

Frances Bishop Morris

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Bruce Stern

Attorney at AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE

777 6Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 55 ] Judgment Order , [ # 54 ] published authored Opinion. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00048-MHL.. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 08/26/2020 07:47 AM]

#58

(#58) COURT ORDER filed denying petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc [ # 56 ] Copies to all parties.. [1000794274] [19-1434] MR [Entered: 08/18/2020 07:49 AM]

#57

(#57) Mandate stayed pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 08/05/2020 07:38 AM]

#56

(#56) PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Haynes Investments, LLC, L. Stephen Haynes and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. [19-1434] Richard Scheff [Entered: 08/04/2020 08:25 PM]

55 #2

Judgment order filed

55 #1

#54

(#54) PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00048-MHL. [1000778217]. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 07/21/2020 09:07 AM]

#53

(#53) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku and Lula Williams. [1000777034]. [19-1434] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 07/17/2020 12:33 PM]

#52

(#52) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Lula Williams, Lawrence Mwethuku, Patrick Inscho, Darlene Gibbs and Stephanie Edwards. [1000762960]. [19-1434] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 06/23/2020 09:22 PM]

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 55 ] Judgment Order , [ # 54 ] published authored Opinion. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00048-MHL.. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 08/26/2020 07:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) COURT ORDER filed denying petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc [ # 56 ] Copies to all parties.. [1000794274] [19-1434] MR [Entered: 08/18/2020 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Mandate stayed pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 08/05/2020 07:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Haynes Investments, LLC, L. Stephen Haynes and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. [19-1434] Richard Scheff [Entered: 08/04/2020 08:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00048-MHL. Entered on Docket Date: 07/21/2020. [1000778222] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 07/21/2020 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00048-MHL. [1000778217]. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 07/21/2020 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by Stephanie Edwards, Darlene Gibbs, Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku and Lula Williams. [1000777034]. [19-1434] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 07/17/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Lula Williams, Lawrence Mwethuku, Patrick Inscho, Darlene Gibbs and Stephanie Edwards. [1000762960]. [19-1434] Matthew Wessler [Entered: 06/23/2020 09:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by Haynes Investments, LLC, L. Stephen Haynes and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. [1000760748]. [19-1434] David Herman [Entered: 06/19/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) COURT ORDER filed submitting on the briefs without oral argument. Copies to all parties. [1000748382] [19-1434] TW [Entered: 05/29/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by L. Stephen Haynes. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000508273] [19-1434] Timothy St. George [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard L. Scheff for Haynes Investments, LLC, L. Stephen Haynes and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. [1000508142] [19-1434] Richard Scheff [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Haynes Investments, LLC, L. Stephen Haynes and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. [19-1434] Timothy St. George [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000508106] [19-1434] Timothy St. George [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Haynes Investments, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000508100] [19-1434] Timothy St. George [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Timothy J. St. George for Haynes Investments, LLC, L. Stephen Haynes and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. [1000508096] [19-1434] Timothy St. George [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David N. Anthony for Haynes Investments, LLC, L. Stephen Haynes and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. [1000508091] [19-1434] David Anthony [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/03/2019. Response Brief due 07/02/2019 [19-1434] MR [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00048-MHL.. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00048-MHL. Case manager: MRadday. [19-1434] MR [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWRENCE MWETHUKU, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated is a litigant

Latest cases where Victory Park Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick O. Daugherty