This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2019 at 06:10:37 (UTC).

Danny Hardin v. Commissioner of Social Sec.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Danny Hardin filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Sec. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11563

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DANNY HARDIN

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael A. Steinberg

Attorney at Michael A. Steinberg & Associates

4925 Independence Pkwy Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33634-7550

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Megan Elizabeth Gideon

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Joseph Paul Palermo III

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Avni Gandhi

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Arthurice Tylune Brundidge

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #4

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Restricted Document #3

DE #19 Order

Open Restricted Document #2

DE #20 Judgment

Open Restricted Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant Danny Hardin. [19-11563] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Danny Hardin. [19-11563] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Michael A. Steinberg for Appellant Danny Hardin. Appellants brief due on 06/17/2019 as to Appellant Danny Hardin. Appendix due on 06/24/2019 as to Appellant Danny Hardin. [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arthurice Brundidge for Commissioner of Social Security [19-11563] (ECF: Arthurice Brundidge) [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Megan Gideon for SSA [19-11563] (ECF: Megan Gideon) [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph Palermo - Appellee [19-11563] (ECF: Joseph Palermo) [Entered: 05/28/2019 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Avni Gandhi for Appellee Commissioner of Social Security. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11563] (ECF: Avni Gandhi) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Avni Gandhi for SSA [19-11563] (ECF: Avni Gandhi) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida for Commissioner of Social Security. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Danny Hardin. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/03/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/08/2019 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Steinberg for Appellant Danny Hardin. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11563] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Steinberg for Appellant Danny Hardin. [19-11563] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael A. Steinberg for Danny Hardin. [19-11563] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Danny Hardin on 04/23/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/08/2019 as to Appellant Danny Hardin. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/22/2019 as to Appellee Commissioner of Social Security [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.