This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2021 at 06:15:05 (UTC).

Danielle Martinez, et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Danielle Martinez filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Gavin Newsom. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56404

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CALIFORNIA SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF, Fremont and Riverside

IRVINE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION

SANTA ANA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

CUPERTINO UNION SCHOOL DISTRICT

MORENO VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

FREMONT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

MT. DIABLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

GARDEN GROVE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

GAVIN NEWSOM, Governor

HAYWARD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

SBE LATITUDE 37.8 HIGH SCHOOL

CORONA-NORCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

SAN JOSE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

CHAFFEY JOINT UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

SBC - HIGH TECH HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

Plaintiff / Appellants

T. W., a minor by his Guardian ad Litem Dahl Johnson

P. C., a minor by her Guardian ad Litem Raven Campbell

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Leonard Bruce Garfinkel Esquire

Attorney at CDE - California Department of Education

1430 N Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Amy Bisson Holloway

Attorney at CDE - California Department of Education

1430 N Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

S. Daniel Harbottle Esquire

Attorney at Harbottle Law Group

18401 Von Karman Ave

Irvine, CA 92612

Sydney J. Blaauw

Attorney at Harbottle Law Group

18401 Von Karman Ave

Irvine, CA 92612

Tracy Petznick Johnson

Attorney at Harbottle Law Group

18401 Von Karman Ave

Irvine, CA 92612

Kirin K. Gill

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Scott Dale Danforth Esquire

Attorney at Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo

12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

Marlon Craig Wadlington Esquire

Attorney at Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo

12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

Seth Gordon Esquire

Attorney at Leone & Alberts

1390 Willow Pass Road, Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520

Louis Leone Esquire

Attorney at STUBBS & LEONE

2175 N. California Blvd.

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Lynn A. Garcia Esquire

Attorney at Spinelli Donald & Nott

601 University Avenue, Suite 225

Sacramento, CA 95825

Domenic D. Spinelli

Attorney at Spinelli Donald & Nott

601 University Avenue, Suite 225

Sacramento, CA 95825

Katherine C. Den Bleyker

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Sue Ann Evans Esquire

Attorney at Dannis Woliver Kelley

115 Pine Avenue, Suite 500

Long Beach, CA 90802

Kevin S. Wattles

Attorney at Soltman Levitt Flaherty & Wattles LLP

90 E. Thousand Oaks Blvd.

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Fazil A. Munir

Attorney at Law Offices of Fazil A Munir

4000 Macarthur Boulevard, Suite 600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Deborah S. Reisdorph

Attorney at Skanadore Reisdorph Law Office

16541 Gothard Street, Suite 208

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Other Attorneys

Mark Saul Posard

Attorney at Gordon Rees LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Thomas Madruga

Attorney at Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill LLP

500 South Grand Avenue, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edward Kang

Attorney at Olivarez Madruga Lemieux O'Neill LLP

500 South Grand Avenue, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11980552] (CL) [Entered: 01/25/2021 04:05 PM]

#20

(#20) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/22/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11957658] (CL) [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:54 PM]

#17

(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellees Capistrano Unified School District, Chaffey Joint Union High School District, Long Beach Unified School District, Milpitas Unified School District, Riverside Unified School District, Santa Ana Unified School District and South Pasadena Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/07/2021. [11956044] [20-56404] (Wadlington, Marlon) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:56 PM]

#16

(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees LAUSD and San Jose Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/07/2021. [11956010] [20-56404] (Evans, Sue) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:44 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Fremont Unified School District, Cupertino Union School District, Oakland Unified School District, MDUSD, San Ramon Valley Unified School District and West Contra Costa Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/06/2021. [11954990] [20-56404] (Leone, Louis) [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:46 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees Hayward Unified School District and San Juan Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/06/2021. [11954875] [20-56404] (Spinelli, Domenic) [Entered: 01/06/2021 04:27 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees Corona-Norco Unified School District, Garden Grove Unified School District, Irvine Unified School District and Moreno Valley Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/05/2021. [11953576] [20-56404] (Blaauw, Sydney) [Entered: 01/05/2021 05:10 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants P. C., Danielle Howard Martinez, D. P., K. P., T. W., Amber Wood and LaShonda Hubbard Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/04/2021. [11951967] [20-56404] (Reisdorph, Deborah) [Entered: 01/04/2021 07:36 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11980552] (CL) [Entered: 01/25/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/22/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11957658] (CL) [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#19) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/07/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11956423]. [20-56404] (AD) [Entered: 01/07/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#18) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/07/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11956421]. [20-56404] (AD) [Entered: 01/07/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellees Capistrano Unified School District, Chaffey Joint Union High School District, Long Beach Unified School District, Milpitas Unified School District, Riverside Unified School District, Santa Ana Unified School District and South Pasadena Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/07/2021. [11956044] [20-56404] (Wadlington, Marlon) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees LAUSD and San Jose Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/07/2021. [11956010] [20-56404] (Evans, Sue) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#15) Added Attorney(s) Tracy Petznick Johnson for party(s) Appellee Moreno Valley Unified School District Appellee Garden Grove Unified School District Appellee Corona-Norco Unified School District Appellee Irvine Unified School District, in case 20-56404. [11955465] (JFF) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#14) Added Attorney(s) S. Daniel Harbottle for party(s) Appellee Moreno Valley Unified School District Appellee Garden Grove Unified School District Appellee Corona-Norco Unified School District Appellee Irvine Unified School District, in case 20-56404. [11955456] (JFF) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#13) Added Attorney(s) Leonard Bruce Garfinkel for party(s) Appellee California School for the Blind Diagnostic Center Appellee California School for the Deaf Appellee Tony Thurmond Appellee California Department of Education, in case 20-56404. [11955451] (JFF) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tracy Petznick Johnson (Harbottle Law Group. 18401 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 200, Irvine, California 92612) for Appellees Corona-Norco Unified School District, Garden Grove Unified School District, Irvine Unified School District and Moreno Valley Unified School District. Date of service: 01/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11955428] [20-56404] (Johnson, Tracy) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Len Garfinkel (California Department of Education, 1430 N Street, Suite 5319, Sacramento, CA 95814) for Appellees California Department of Education, California School for the Blind Diagnostic Center, California School for the Deaf and Tony Thurmond. Date of service: 01/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11955224] [20-56404] (Garfinkel, Leonard) [Entered: 01/07/2021 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/06/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11955029]. [20-56404] (AD) [Entered: 01/06/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/06/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11955028]. [20-56404] (AD) [Entered: 01/06/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Fremont Unified School District, Cupertino Union School District, Oakland Unified School District, MDUSD, San Ramon Valley Unified School District and West Contra Costa Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/06/2021. [11954990] [20-56404] (Leone, Louis) [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees Hayward Unified School District and San Juan Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/06/2021. [11954875] [20-56404] (Spinelli, Domenic) [Entered: 01/06/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/05/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11953643]. [20-56404] (AD) [Entered: 01/05/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees Corona-Norco Unified School District, Garden Grove Unified School District, Irvine Unified School District and Moreno Valley Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/05/2021. [11953576] [20-56404] (Blaauw, Sydney) [Entered: 01/05/2021 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/04/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11952067]. [20-56404] (AD) [Entered: 01/05/2021 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants P. C., Danielle Howard Martinez, D. P., K. P., T. W., Amber Wood and LaShonda Hubbard Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/04/2021. [11951967] [20-56404] (Reisdorph, Deborah) [Entered: 01/04/2021 07:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants P. C., LaShonda Hubbard, Danielle Howard Martinez, D. P., K. P., T. W. and Amber Wood Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/05/2021. Transcript ordered by 01/28/2021. Transcript due 02/26/2021. Appellants P. C., LaShonda Hubbard, Danielle Howard Martinez, D. P., K. P., T. W. and Amber Wood opening brief due 04/06/2021. Appellees California Department of Education, California Department of Public Health, California Health and Human Services, California School for the Blind Diagnostic Center, California School for the Deaf, California State Board of Education, Capistrano Unified School District, Chaffey Joint Union High School District, Corona-Norco Unified School District, Cupertino Union School District, Etiwanda Elementary School District, Fremont Unified School District, Garden Grove Unified School District, Hayward Unified School District, Irvine Unified School District, Long Beach Unified School District, Los Angeles Unified School District, Milpitas Unified School District, Moreno Valley Unified School District, Mt. Diablo Unified School District, Gavin Newsom, Oakland Unified School District, Riverside Unified School District, SBC - High Tech High School District, SBE Latitude 37.8 High School, San Bernardino City Unified School District, San Francisco Unified School District, San Jose Unified School District, San Juan Unified School District, San Ramon Valley Unified School District, Santa Ana Unified School District, Sandra Shewry, South Pasadena Unified School District, State of California, Tony Thurmond and West Contra Costa Unified School District answering brief due 05/06/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11947685] (RT) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Jose Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases where FREMONT UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where HAYWARD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant