This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/20/2021 at 06:04:08 (UTC).

Daniel Scouten, et al v. Midland County Jail, et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Daniel Scouten filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Midland County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2953

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL N. SCOUTEN

Defendant

MIDLAND COUNTY, MI JAIL

Plaintiff / Appellant

CORY O'DELL DERRICK

Midland, MI 48642

Defendant / Appellees

MIDLAND COUNTY, MI

ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Cory O'Dell Derrick

Attorney at Midland County Jail

105 Fast Ice Drive

Midland, MI 48642

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ronald W. Chapman Sr.

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 W. Long Lake Roadsuite 310

Troy, MI 48098

Madeline Young

1441 W. Long Lake Roadsuite 310

Troy, MI 48098

Devlin Kyle Scarber

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 W. Long Lake Roadsuite 310

Troy, MI 48098

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

(#3) Copy of District Court Order filed denying in forma pauperis. (MRL) [Entered: 09/28/2021 12:34 PM]

#4

(#4) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (MRL) [Entered: 09/28/2021 12:54 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc. by Devlin Scarber. Certificate of Service: 09/29/2021. [21-2953] (DKS) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:42 PM]

#7

(#7) CORRESPONDENCE: by Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick. (MRL) [Entered: 10/04/2021 03:57 PM]

#8

(#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 10/05/2021. (MRL) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:02 PM]

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) CORRESPONDENCE: Correspondence regarding covid-19 prison protocol by Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick. (MRL) [Entered: 10/28/2021 02:29 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORRESPONDENCE: Correspondence regarding covid-19 prison protocol by Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick. (MRL) [Entered: 10/28/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docket(#11) Update fee status change to pending in 6th Circuit. (MRL) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (MRL) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick Certificate of Service: 10/05/2021. (MRL) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 10/05/2021. (MRL) [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRESPONDENCE: by Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick. (MRL) [Entered: 10/04/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc. by Devlin Scarber. Certificate of Service: 09/29/2021. [21-2953] (DKS) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NATIVE .PDF DOCUMENT SO FORM IS NOT MODIFIABLE***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc. by Devlin Scarber. Certificate of Service: 09/29/2021. [21-2953] (DKS) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (MRL) [Entered: 09/28/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Copy of District Court Order filed denying in forma pauperis. (MRL) [Entered: 09/28/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Michelle R. Lambert (MRL) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Cory O'Dell Derrick. Transcript needed: n. (MRL) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland County is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madeline Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Devlin Kyle Scarber