This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:05:42 (UTC).

Daniel Mattea v. USAA General Indemnity Co.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Daniel Mattea filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1486

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Daniel T. Mattea

Defendant / Appellee

USAA General Indemnity Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Frederick G. Thompson IV

Attorney at GOULD & THOMPSON

Suite 100, 1441 E. 104Th Street

Kansas City, MO 64131

Robert Ernest Gould

Attorney at GOULD & THOMPSON

Suite 100, 1441 E. 104Th Street

Kansas City, MO 64131

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jean-Paul Assouad

Attorney at KUTAK & ROCK

Suite 800, Two Pershing Square, 2300 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

Kevin Dale Brooks

Attorney at KUTAK & ROCK

Suite 800, Two Pershing Square, 2300 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee USAA General Indemnity Co.. - FOR CAL [4767149] [19-1486] (JA) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:47 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 02/06/2019, Judgment dated 02/06/2019[4764853] [19-1486] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:19 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/22/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Frederick G. Thompson, IV for Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea w/service 04/18/2019. [4779287] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/22/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Daniel T Mattea due 04/22/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4764859] [19-1486] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:23 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Frederick G. Thompson, IV for Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea w/service 03/25/2019 [4770450] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:55 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4779287-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Frederick G. Thompson, IV. Appellant brief of Daniel T. Mattea due 05/22/2019. Appendix due on 05/22/2019. [4779506] [19-1486] (BNW) [Entered: 04/19/2019 11:25 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jean-Paul Assouad for Appellee USAA General Indemnity Co. w/service 03/15/2019 [4767142] [19-1486] (JA) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:42 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4764846] [19-1486] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:11 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea. No Transcript[4770445] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Kevin D. Brooks for Appellee USAA General Indemnity Co. w/service 03/15/2019 [4767144] [19-1486] (JA) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:44 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea - w/service 03/25/2019. [4770439] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:40 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation AND DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea - Joint Appendix - w/service 03/25/2019 [4770447] [19-1486] [Edited to include Designation of Record 03/26/2019 by BNW] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:47 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4779287-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Frederick G. Thompson, IV. Appellant brief of Daniel T. Mattea due 05/22/2019. Appendix due on 05/22/2019. [4779506] [19-1486] (BNW) [Entered: 04/19/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/22/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Frederick G. Thompson, IV for Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea w/service 04/18/2019. [4779287] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea - w/service 03/25/2019. [4770619] [19-1486] ENTRY FILED IN ERROR.--[Edited 03/26/2019 by AMT] (BNW) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Frederick G. Thompson, IV for Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea w/service 03/25/2019 [4770450] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation AND DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea - Joint Appendix - w/service 03/25/2019 [4770447] [19-1486] [Edited to include Designation of Record 03/26/2019 by BNW] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea. No Transcript[4770445] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel T. Mattea - w/service 03/25/2019. [4770439] [19-1486] (FGT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee USAA General Indemnity Co.. - FOR CAL [4767149] [19-1486] (JA) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Kevin D. Brooks for Appellee USAA General Indemnity Co. w/service 03/15/2019 [4767144] [19-1486] (JA) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Jean-Paul Assouad for Appellee USAA General Indemnity Co. w/service 03/15/2019 [4767142] [19-1486] (JA) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/22/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Daniel T Mattea due 04/22/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4764859] [19-1486] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 02/06/2019, Judgment dated 02/06/2019[4764853] [19-1486] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4764846] [19-1486] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.