This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/18/2020 at 05:26:36 (UTC).

Daniel Martins v. Flowers Foods, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 Daniel Martins filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Flowers Foods, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11378

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellants

FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF VILLA RICA, LLC.

FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF JACKSONVILLE

FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF MIAMI, LLC

FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF BRADENTON, LLC

FLOWERS BAKING CO. OF THOMASVILLE, LLC

FLOWERS FOODS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

DANIEL MARTINS, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Hunter Hughes

1075 Peachtree St Ste 2550

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Nathan J. Allen

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4800

Atlanta, GA 30303

Kevin Douglas Zwetsch

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5867

Kevin Patrick Hishta

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4800

Atlanta, GA 30303

Margaret Santen Hanrahan

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

201 S College St Ste 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

Calvin Garner Sanford Jr.

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4800

Atlanta, GA 30303

Benjamin R. Holland

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

201 S College St Ste 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

Michael Dean Ray

Attorney at Law Office of Michael D. Ray

124 S Miami Ave

Miami, FL 33130-1605

Helen Anne Palladeno

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5867

Christopher M. Cascino

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

155 N Wacker Dr Ste 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adeash AJ Lakraj

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 4200

Atlanta, GA 30303

Chanelle Ventura

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

8151 Peters Rd Ste 4000

Plantation, FL 33324

Andrew R. Frisch

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

8151 Peters Rd Ste 4000

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #235

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fees received $ 505 receipt number TPA060665 was paid on 04/13/2020 as to Appellants Flowers Baking Co. of Bradenton, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Jacksonville, Flowers Baking Co. of Miami, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Thomasville, LLC and Flowers Baking Co. of Villa Rica, LLC.. [Entered: 04/16/2020 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Flowers Baking Co. of Bradenton, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Jacksonville, Flowers Baking Co. of Miami, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Thomasville, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Villa Rica, LLC. and Flowers Foods, Inc. on 04/10/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/20/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/24/2020 as to Appellant Flowers Baking Co. of Bradenton, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/08/2020 as to Appellee Daniel Martins [Entered: 04/16/2020 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flowers Baking Co of Tyler L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Flowers Baking Co. of Miami, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Flowers Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant