This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 06:10:11 (UTC).

Daniel Cortes v. Doctor Thomas, et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Daniel Cortes filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Doctor Thomas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1191

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DOCTOR THOMAS, D.D.S.

JANE DOE, Doctor, D.D.S.

Plaintiff / Appellant

DANIEL CORTES

Menard, IL 62259-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Daniel Cortes

Attorney at MENARD CORRECTIONAL CENTER

P.O. Box 1000

Menard, IL 62259-0000

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER issued DENYING motion for appointment of counsel. [ # 6 ] WLS [8] [6987738] [19-1191] (AD) [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:38 PM]

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

#7

(#7) ORDER: Appellant Daniel Cortes is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. JR. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Daniel Cortes by 03/11/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 1516. [7] [6986593] [19-1191] (AG) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:34 AM]

#2

(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6980815] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1191] (CAG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:33 AM]

5 #1

Jurisdictional Memorandum

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

#6

(#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Daniel Cortes for appointment of counsel. [6] [6986502] [19-1191] (CAG) [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:19 PM]

#3

(#3) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [3][6983014] [19-1191] (CCG) [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:05 PM]

5 #3

Exhibit

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant Daniel Cortes shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6983168] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Daniel Cortes by 02/22/2019. [4] [6983168] [19-1191] (FP) [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Daniel Cortes. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [6990000] [19-1191] (AG) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:17 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

5 #2

Exhibit

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Daniel Cortes. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [6990000] [19-1191] (AG) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER issued DENYING motion for appointment of counsel. [ # 6 ] WLS [8] [6987738] [19-1191] (AD) [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Appellant Daniel Cortes is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. JR. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Daniel Cortes by 03/11/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 1516. [7] [6986593] [19-1191] (AG) [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Daniel Cortes for appointment of counsel. [6] [6986502] [19-1191] (CAG) [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Daniel Cortes. [5] [6986498] [19-1191] (CAG) [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Appellant Daniel Cortes shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6983168] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Daniel Cortes by 02/22/2019. [4] [6983168] [19-1191] (FP) [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [3][6983014] [19-1191] (CCG) [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6980815] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1191] (CAG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Daniel Cortes by 02/04/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 02/27/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 02/11/2019. [1] [6980807] [19-1191] (CAG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.