This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 06:09:15 (UTC).

Daniel Cobble v. Cobb County District Attorney, et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Daniel Cobble filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Cobb County District Attorney. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-14342

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

DANIEL ERIC COBBLE

Americus, GA 31709

Respondent / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, includes all GA District Judges

SUMTER COUNTY SHERIFF

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF GEORGIA

COBB COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Daniel Eric Cobble

Attorney at Sumter County Jail - Inmate Legal Mail

352 Mcmath Mill Rd

Americus, GA 31709

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Alabama

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

131 Clayton St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Brett Joseph Talley

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

131 Clayton St

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:56 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brett Joseph Talley for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14342] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:53 PM]

Open Restricted Document #3

MOT-9 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

MOTION Motion for U.S. Court of Appeals to Rule filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941769-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:34 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Motion to proceed IFP

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brett J. Talley for USA [19-14342] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:34 PM]

Open Document

Notice of filing: Notice of More Evidence as to Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. [Entered: 11/27/2019 08:25 AM]

Open Document #1

HAB-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

R&R- Doc #2

Open Document

MOTION for clerk to file all motions as future brief filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941831-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:53 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Daniel Eric Cobble. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/15/2019 07:45 AM]

Open Document

This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in this Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 12/05/2019 08:06 AM]

Open Restricted Document #1

IFP-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble was filed on 10/31/2019. Docket Entry 7. [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:56 PM]

Open Document #4

USDC Order- Doc #4

Open Document

MOTION for attorney's fees or costs filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941780-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:40 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8962022-1] [Entered: 12/18/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in this Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 12/05/2019 08:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brett Joseph Talley for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14342] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Brett Joseph Talley for USA and U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Alabama for USA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of filing: Notice of More Evidence as to Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. [Entered: 11/27/2019 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for clerk to file all motions as future brief filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941831-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION Illegible Motion filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941825-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for attorney's fees or costs filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941780-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION Motion for U.S. Court of Appeals to Rule filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8941769-1] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brett J. Talley for USA [19-14342] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Daniel Eric Cobble. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/15/2019 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble was filed on 10/31/2019. Docket Entry 7. [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Daniel Eric Cobble on 10/21/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.