This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2019 at 06:05:03 (UTC).

Daniel Birchfield v. Rushmore Loan Management Svc

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Daniel Birchfield filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Rushmore Loan Management Svc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1241

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

DANIEL BIRCHFIELD

KATHLEEN BIRCHFIELD

Defendant / Appellees

RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

RMAC REMIC TRUST, SERIES 2009-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gary Michael Smith

Attorney at MOUNTAIN STATE JUSTICE

1217 Quarrier Street

Charleston, WV 25301-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Andrew Faulkner Pahl

Attorney at STERN & EISENBERG MID ATLANTIC, PC

55 Meridian Parkway

Martinsburg, WV 25404

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) ORDER filed [1000482393] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 05/13/2019. Number of days granted: 28. Opening brief and appendix due 05/13/2019. Response brief due 06/11/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:55 PM]

#12

(#12) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and RMAC Remic Trust, Series 2009-5. [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:29 PM]

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000479166] [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:24 PM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by RMAC Remic Trust, Series 2009-5. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000479160] [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:20 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew F. Pahl for RMAC Remic Trust, Series 2009-5 and Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. [1000479107] [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:44 PM]

#8

(#8) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1241] MRB [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:21 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Kathleen Birchfield. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000473662] [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:06 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Daniel Birchfield. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000473658] [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:05 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gary M. Smith for Daniel Birchfield and Kathleen Birchfield. [1000473656] [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:05 PM]

#4

(#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Daniel Birchfield and Kathleen Birchfield. [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:03 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/15/2019. Response Brief due 05/14/2019 [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:47 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00142-JPB.. [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:46 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00142-JPB. Case manager: MRadday. [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:43 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1241] MRB [Entered: 04/18/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER filed [1000482393] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 05/13/2019. Number of days granted: 28. Opening brief and appendix due 05/13/2019. Response brief due 06/11/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and RMAC Remic Trust, Series 2009-5. [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000479166] [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by RMAC Remic Trust, Series 2009-5. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000479160] [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew F. Pahl for RMAC Remic Trust, Series 2009-5 and Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. [1000479107] [19-1241] Andrew Pahl [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1241] MRB [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Kathleen Birchfield. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000473662] [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Daniel Birchfield. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000473658] [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gary M. Smith for Daniel Birchfield and Kathleen Birchfield. [1000473656] [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Daniel Birchfield and Kathleen Birchfield. [19-1241] Gary Smith [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/15/2019. Response Brief due 05/14/2019 [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00142-JPB.. [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00142-JPB. Case manager: MRadday. [19-1241] MR [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less