This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 06:12:37 (UTC).

Dana Hollister v. Bobs, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Dana Hollister filed an Other lawsuit against Bobs, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1038

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

DANA HOLLISTER

Debtor

In re: DANA HOLLISTER

Appellees

THE BIRD NEST, LLC

DEANNA STAATS

ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION SOLE, AND THE CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF THE SISTERS OF THE MOST HOLY AND IMMACULATE HEART OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.S

BOBS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

David A. Tilem Esquire

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID A. TILEM

206 North Jackson Street

Glendale, CA 91206

Appellee Attorneys

Howard J. Steinberg

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

1840 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Eric Rowen

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1840 Century Park E.

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jacquelyn H. Choi

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

2029 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Hamid R. Rafatjoo Esquire

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, 21St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

J. Michael Hennigan

Attorney at McKool Smith & Hennigan, P.C.

300 S. Grand Ave.

Los Angeles, CA 90071-0000

Kirk Dillman

Attorney at McKool Smith & Hennigan, P.C.

300 S. Grand Ave.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Storm Byrd

Attorney at McKool Smith & Hennigan, P.C.

300 S. Grand Ave.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rebecca L. Wilson Esquire

Attorney at Kutak Rock Llp

5 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614-8595

Steven M. Dailey Esquire

Attorney at Kutak Rock Llp

5 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614-8595

Matthew D. Resnik

Attorney at Resnik Hayes Moradi LLP

17609 Ventura Blvd., Encino

Encino, CA 91316

M. Jonathan Hayes

17609 Ventura Blvd.

Encino, CA 91316

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Notice of Referral

2 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

#2

Briefing Order

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

2 #4

E-filing Administrative Order

2 #5

BAP Rules

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Deficient Brief sent to Attorney David A. Tilem, Esquire for Appellant Dana Hollister Re: excerpts of the record not filed. Deficient Brief Response due 04/28/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 04/14/2021 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Attorney David A. Tilem, Esquire for Appellant Dana Hollister's brief on appeal; served on 04/13/2021 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Byrd, Dillman, Hennigan, Rafatjoo, Rowen, Steinberg; email - Attorney for Appellees: Choi, Dailey, Hayes, Resnik, Wilson; Attorney for Appellant: Tilem. [21-1038] (DAT) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#4) DISREGARD THIS DOCKET ENTRY. Filed (ECF) Attorney David A. Tilem, Esquire for Appellant Dana Hollister's copy of excerpts of record in support of petition for direct appeal pending at court of appeals ; served on 03/18/2021 email - Attorney for Appellees: Dailey, Dillman, Hayes, Hennigan, Resnik, Wilson; Attorney for Appellant: Tilem. [21-1038]--[Edited 03/18/2021 by SMS] (DAT) [Entered: 03/18/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of order denying debtor's motion for post-petition financ ing; authorizing direct appeal. filed in Bk. Ct. 03/08/2021.--[Edited 03/08/2021 by MW] (CLS) [Entered: 03/08/2021 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Dana Hollister. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Dana Hollister's opening brief due 04/12/2021. (CLS) [Entered: 02/26/2021 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 02/25/2021, notice of referral, transmittal form,. Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Records Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (CLS) [Entered: 02/26/2021 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOBS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHIBISHOP OF LOS is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Tilem Esquire