This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/25/2022 at 06:04:25 (UTC).

Damont Hagan v. Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Damont Hagan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1324

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DAMONT HAGAN

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Defendant / Appellees

PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

SUPERINTENDENT CAMP HILL SCI

Debtor / Appellee

DISTRICT ATTORNEY CUMBERLAND COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Damont Hagan

Attorney at Camp Hill SCI

P.O. Box 8837, 2500 Lisburn Road

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan M. Blake Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Courrt Order

1 #3

District Court Memorandum

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Standing Order

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

3 #1

Send screening letter

3 #2

attachment

#3

Amended Screen

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE, PA ATTORNEY GENERAL, JOHN WETZEL, LAUREL HARRY. [22-1324] (HGH) [Entered: 03/07/2022 01:33 PM]

5 #1

Returned Mail

5 #2

Returned Mail Letter

#6

(#6) MOTION filed by Appellant Damont Hagan for Extension Time to File Application for Certificate of Appealability. Response, if any, due on 04/11/2022. (CJG) [Entered: 03/30/2022 11:57 AM]

#7

(#7) ORDER (Clerk) The motion for extension of time is granted. Appellants application for a certificate of appealability must be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. If Appellant does not file an application for a certificate of appealability by the deadline established, Appellants notice of appeal will be deemed to be such an application and will be submitted by the Clerk of this Court to a panel of the Court for consideration (SB) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:53 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER (Clerk) The motion for extension of time is granted. Appellants application for a certificate of appealability must be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. If Appellant does not file an application for a certificate of appealability by the deadline established, Appellants notice of appeal will be deemed to be such an application and will be submitted by the Clerk of this Court to a panel of the Court for consideration (SB) [Entered: 04/01/2022 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION filed by Appellant Damont Hagan for Extension Time to File Application for Certificate of Appealability. Response, if any, due on 04/11/2022. (CJG) [Entered: 03/30/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURNED MAIL. U.S. Postal Service returned Case Opening Packet [ # 1 ] sent to Appellant Damont Hagan. Mail was returned because Appellant moved institutions. The address has been updated and mail resent. The deadlines set forth originally are extended by 14 days. (SB) [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE, PA ATTORNEY GENERAL, JOHN WETZEL, LAUREL HARRY. [22-1324] (HGH) [Entered: 03/07/2022 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for possible summary action AND for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (ZM) [Entered: 02/28/2022 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 02/24/2022 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Damont Hagan in District Court No. 1-20-cv-02335. (SB) [Entered: 02/24/2022 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE is a litigant

Latest cases where SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M. Blake Esq.