This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2022 at 06:04:57 (UTC).

Dali Wireless Inc. v. CommScope Technologies LLC

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 Dali Wireless Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CommScope Technologies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1699

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

DALI WIRELESS INC.

Defendant / Appellees

COMMSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES LLC

COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Cristofer Leffler

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

1200 Westlake Avenue N, Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Joseph Abraham

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

13492 Research Boulevard

Austin, TX 78750

Alexandra O. Fellowes

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

1200 Westlake Avenue N, Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

Stefan Szpajda

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

1200 Westlake Avenue N, Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

David E. Moore Esq.

1313 N Market Street, Hercules Plaza, 6Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kelly Farnan

One Rodney Square, 920 N King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Philip P. Caspers

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist PA

225 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

William F. Bullard

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist PA

225 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Samuel A. Hamer Esq.

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist PA

225 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) [The Transcript of Proceedings] for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 04/27/2022 by email. [845861] [22-1699] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 04/27/2022 06:14 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Cristofer Leffler;Alexandra Fellowes;Stefan Szpajda;Joseph M. Abraham as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 04/27/2022 by email. [845863] [22-1699] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 04/27/2022 06:18 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 04/27/2022 by email. [845864] [22-1699] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 04/27/2022 06:23 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Dali Wireless Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/05/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [845911] [JCW] [Entered: 04/28/2022 09:04 AM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Principal Counsel, Philip P. Caspers; Other Counsel, Samuel A. Hamer; Other Counsel, William F. Bullard as counsel for Appellee CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847563] [22-1699] [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:00 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellee CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847565] [22-1699] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 11 ]. [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:02 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847566] [22-1699] [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:03 PM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Cristofer Leffler; Joseph M. Abraham; Stefan Szpajda as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847650] [22-1699] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 12 ]. [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 05/04/2022 06:51 PM]

10 #1

Docketing Statement

10 #2

Attachment A

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees CommScope Holding Company, Inc. and CommScope Technologies LLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/16/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [848376] [ALK] [Entered: 05/09/2022 09:11 AM]

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Dali Wireless Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 9 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/16/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [848379] [ALK] [Entered: 05/09/2022 09:16 AM]

#13

(#13) Corrected Entry of appearance for Cristofer Leffler; Joseph M. Abraham; Stefan Szpajda; Alexandra Fellowes as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 05/09/2022 by email. [848674] [22-1699] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 05/09/2022 08:03 PM]

#14

(#14) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees CommScope Holding Company, Inc. and CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/13/2022 by email. [849644] [22-1699] [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/13/2022 11:15 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees CommScope Holding Company, Inc. and CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/13/2022 by email. [849644] [22-1699] [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/13/2022 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corrected Entry of appearance for Cristofer Leffler; Joseph M. Abraham; Stefan Szpajda; Alexandra Fellowes as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 05/09/2022 by email. [848674] [22-1699] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 05/09/2022 08:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Dali Wireless Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 9 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/16/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [848379] [ALK] [Entered: 05/09/2022 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees CommScope Holding Company, Inc. and CommScope Technologies LLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/16/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [848376] [ALK] [Entered: 05/09/2022 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847651] [22-1699] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 05/04/2022 06:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Cristofer Leffler; Joseph M. Abraham; Stefan Szpajda as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847650] [22-1699] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 12 ]. [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 05/04/2022 06:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Appellee CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847566] [22-1699] [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellee CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847565] [22-1699] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 11 ]. [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Principal Counsel, Philip P. Caspers; Other Counsel, Samuel A. Hamer; Other Counsel, William F. Bullard as counsel for Appellee CommScope Technologies LLC. Service: 05/04/2022 by email. [847563] [22-1699] [Philip Caspers] [Entered: 05/04/2022 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Dali Wireless Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/05/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [845911] [JCW] [Entered: 04/28/2022 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 04/27/2022 by email. [845864] [22-1699] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 04/27/2022 06:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Cristofer Leffler;Alexandra Fellowes;Stefan Szpajda;Joseph M. Abraham as counsel for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 04/27/2022 by email. [845863] [22-1699] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 5 ] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 04/27/2022 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Compliance with Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) [The Transcript of Proceedings] for Appellant Dali Wireless Inc.. Service: 04/27/2022 by email. [845861] [22-1699] [Cristofer Leffler] [Entered: 04/27/2022 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/18/2022. [844286] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/04/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/04/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 05/04/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 06/21/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMSCOPE HOLDING COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DALI WIRELESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CommScope Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William F. Bullard