This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/16/2021 at 06:08:55 (UTC).

Dale Sundby v. Marquee Funding Group, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Dale Sundby filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Marquee Funding Group, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55504

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MARQUEE FUNDING GROUP, INC.

VICKIE MCCARTY

ANDRES SALSIDO, Trustee

BENNING MANAGEMENT GROUP 401(K) PROFIT SHARING PLAN

STANLEY W. KESSELMAN

DOLORES THOMPSON

STEVEN M. COBIN, Trustee; Custodian

KIMBERLY GILL RABINOFF

SUSAN L. COBIN, Trustee

JEFFREY MYERS

SALOMON BENZIMRA

TODD B. COBIN, Trustee

DOES, I-X

CHRISTOPHER MYERS

FASAK INVESTMENTS LLC

KATHLEEN MYERS

BARBARA A. COBIN, Trustee

Plaintiff / Appellant

DALE SUNDBY, Trustee

7740 Eads Avenue

La Jolla, CA 92037

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lewis R. Landau

Attorney at Law Office of L. Landau

22287 Mulholland Hwy., # 318

Calabasas, CA 91302

Troy Slome

Attorney at Murphy Rosen Meylan & Davitt LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dale Sundby

7740 Eads Avenue

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorney Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Cross-Appeal Briefing Chart

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

#2

Main Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#4

#5

#7

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Salomon Benzimra, Barbara A. Cobin, Steven M. Cobin, Susan L. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Fasak Investments LLC, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Stanley W. Kesselman, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Andres Salsido and Dolores Thompson Correspondence: Notice of Additional Transcripts for Appeal Under Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, Circuit Rule 10-3.1(b). Date of service: 06/07/2021 [12136001] [21-55504] (Slome, Troy) [Entered: 06/07/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: First cross appeal brief due 08/25/2021 for Dale Sundby. Second brief on cross appeal due 09/24/2021 for Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Salomon Benzimra, Barbara A. Cobin, Steven M. Cobin, Susan L. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Fasak Investments LLC, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Stanley W. Kesselman, Marquee Funding Group, Inc., Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Andres Salsido and Dolores Thompson. Third brief on cross appeal due 10/25/2021 for Dale Sundby. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [12134481] [21-55582, 21-55504] (JBS) [Entered: 06/04/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellees Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Salomon Benzimra, Barbara A. Cobin, Steven M. Cobin, Susan L. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Fasak Investments LLC, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Stanley W. Kesselman, Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Andres Salsido and Dolores Thompson Correspondence: Notice of Association of Counsel for Cross-Appeal in this matter. Date of service: 06/04/2021 [12133732] [21-55504] (Slome, Troy) [Entered: 06/04/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Participants with an email address on the attached list will receive an email with dial-in information. If an email address is not listed or if there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Participants may also leave a message at (415) 355-7900 to request dial-in information. Finally, please notify Circuit Mediator Jonathan Westen immediately by email (Jonathan_Westen@ca9.uscourts.gov) if a participant has an unavoidable scheduling conflict. Please copy all participants on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All written or spoken communication with the mediator, including the discussions during the scheduled conference, are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. Additional information about confidentiality (including a copy of Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1), the assessment conference, and the Mediation Program are attached and can also be found at the Mediation Program website (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. (Date: June 24, 2021 Time: 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time) (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [12125647] (AF) [Entered: 05/26/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD $505. Date paid: 05/18/2021. [12117944] (WL) [Entered: 05/19/2021 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12117857] (CKP) [Entered: 05/19/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 06/16/2021. Transcript due 07/16/2021. Appellant Dale Sundby opening brief due 08/25/2021. Appellees Benning Management Group 401(k) Profit Sharing Plan, Salomon Benzimra, Barbara A. Cobin, Steven M. Cobin, Susan L. Cobin, Todd B. Cobin, Does, Fasak Investments LLC, Kimberly Gill Rabinoff, Stanley W. Kesselman, Marquee Funding Group, Inc., Vickie McCarty, Christopher Myers, Jeffrey Myers, Kathleen Myers, Andres Salsido and Dolores Thompson answering brief due 09/24/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12115292] (JBS) [Entered: 05/17/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benning Management Group 401k Profit Sharing Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where MARQUEE FUNDING GROUP INC is a litigant