This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2019 at 06:05:06 (UTC).

Dale Kaymark v. Bank of America NA, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Dale Kaymark filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bank of America NA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1424

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

MICHAEL P. MALAKOFF

Pittsburgh, PA 15204

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

UDREN LAW OFFICES PC

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Plaintiff / Appellant

DALE KAYMARK, individually and on behalf of other similarly situated current and former homeowners in Pennsylvania

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael P. Malakoff Esq.

Attorney at Michael P. Malakoff

3214 Ladoga Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15204

John C. Evans Esq.

Attorney at JC Evans Law

436 Seventh Avenue, Koppers Building, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel S. Bernheim Esq. III

Attorney at Wilentz Goldman & Spitzer

Two Penn Center Plaza, Suite 910

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Jonathan J. Bart Esq.

Attorney at Wilentz Goldman & Spitzer

Two Penn Center Plaza, Suite 910

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Andrew J. Soven Esq.

Attorney at Holland & Knight

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:58 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: AMENDED Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, received. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, received. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:51 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, filed. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:51 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael P. Malakoff on behalf of Appellant(s) Dale Kaymark, Michael Malakoff. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:50 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jonathan J. Bart, Esq. for Bank of America NA and Udren Law Offices PC, Daniel S. Bernheim, III, Esq. for Udren Law Offices PC and Andrew J. Soven, Esq. for Bank of America NA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 04/08/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:25 AM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to John C. Evans, Esq. for Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, Esq. for Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on, Information Statement, Concise Summary, and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/08/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:22 AM]

Open Document #2

Supreme Court Opinion

Open Document #1

Letter to the Court (Information Purposes Only)

Open Document

ECF FILER: AMENDED Response filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2019. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:18 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Udren Law Offices PC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2018. [19-1424] (JJB) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:51 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/19/2019. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:52 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff for Extension of Time to file Response to court order until/for one week. Certificate of Service dated 03/11/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:34 PM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) This appeal seeks review of the district courts January 22, 2019, order and its February 7, 2019, order. Neither order appears to be final within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1291 or otherwise appealable at this time. Additionally, the notice of appeal was not filed within thirty days of the January order. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1). All parties must file written responses addressing these issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (LMR) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:29 AM]

Open Document #4

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

STANDING ORDER

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Case Opening Letter

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: AMENDED Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, received. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, received. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [-Document was blank. Counsel has refiled a completed form. Document has been removed.]--[Edited 04/12/2019 by CJG] [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, filed. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael P. Malakoff on behalf of Appellant(s) Dale Kaymark, Michael Malakoff. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jonathan J. Bart, Esq. for Bank of America NA and Udren Law Offices PC, Daniel S. Bernheim, III, Esq. for Udren Law Offices PC and Andrew J. Soven, Esq. for Bank of America NA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 04/08/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to John C. Evans, Esq. for Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff, Esq. for Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on, Information Statement, Concise Summary, and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/08/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Michael P. Malakoff, Esq. for Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff Notice of Supplemental Authority. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: AMENDED Response filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2019. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Udren Law Offices PC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2018. [19-1424] (JJB) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/19/2019. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Clerk's Order dated February 26, 2019 filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff. Appellant's response to the Clerk's order must be filed on or before March 19, 2019. (DW) [Entered: 03/14/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff for Extension of Time to file Response to court order until/for one week. Certificate of Service dated 03/11/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1424] (MPM) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) This appeal seeks review of the district courts January 22, 2019, order and its February 7, 2019, order. Neither order appears to be final within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1291 or otherwise appealable at this time. Additionally, the notice of appeal was not filed within thirty days of the January order. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1). All parties must file written responses addressing these issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (LMR) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Dale Kaymark and Michael P. Malakoff in District Court No. 2-13-cv-00419. (LMR) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less