This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:34:24 (UTC).

Dakota Zerbst v. University of Phoenix

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Dakota Zerbst filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against University of Phoenix. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1312

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Dakota Lee Zerbst

Rapid City, SD 57701

Defendant / Appellee

University of Phoenix

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dakota Lee Zerbst

Attorney at PENNINGTON COUNTY JAIL

307 St. Joseph Street

Rapid City, SD 57701

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Letter in support of appeal

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4881499] [20-1312] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:06 PM]

Open Document #1

Letter in support of appeal

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 03/12/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4881496] [20-1312] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:03 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 1/27/2020, second notice of appeal filed 2/3/2020, docket entries, order filed 1/9/2020, judgment filed 1/9/2020, and order denying IFP filed 2/12/2020. [4881493] [20-1312] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:00 PM]

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellant Mr. Dakota Lee Zerbst in support of appeal. w/service 02/13/2020 [4881566] [20-1312] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4881499] [20-1312] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 03/12/2020, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4881496] [20-1312] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 1/27/2020, second notice of appeal filed 2/3/2020, docket entries, order filed 1/9/2020, judgment filed 1/9/2020, and order denying IFP filed 2/12/2020. [4881493] [20-1312] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [4881467] [20-1312] (changed from civil to prisoner)--[Edited 02/13/2020 by CMW] (CBO) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.