This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2019 at 05:08:18 (UTC).

Dailiuva Gonzalez-Garcia v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 a Other case was filed by Dailiuva Gonzalez-Garcia against William Barr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-72859

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAILIUVA GONZALEZ-GARCIA

Eloy, AZ 85131

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dailiuva Gonzalez-Garcia

Attorney at EDC - ELOY DETENTION CENTER

1705 E. Hanna Rd.

Eloy, AZ 85131

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Petition for Review

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Petitioner Dailiuva Gonzalez-Garcia motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/07/2019. [11496232][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 11/13/2019 by BY] (JBS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Petitioner Dailiuva Gonzalez-Garcia motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/07/2019. [11496231][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 11/13/2019 by BY] (JBS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review. PRO SE. Petitioner detained? YES. Certified Administrative Record due 12/17/2019. Petitioner opening brief due 02/18/2020 for Dailiuva Gonzalez-Garcia. Respondent brief due 04/15/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. (Motion for IFP & Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel within petition) [11496226][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 11/13/2019 by BY] (JBS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less