This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/26/2021 at 06:03:58 (UTC).

D2 Excavating v. Thompson Thrift

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 D2 Excavating filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Thompson Thrift. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40629

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

D2 Excavating, Incorporated

Defendant / Appellants

Thompson Thrift Construction, Incorporated

Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Philip Collier

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Marc James Ayers Esq.

Ian Peter Faria

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2021

DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-40629] (MRW) [Entered: 10/13/2021 09:44 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9682656-2] NOA filed by Appellants Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland and Thompson Thrift Construction, Incorporated. [9682656-1] [21-40629] (CAG) [Entered: 10/06/2021 10:58 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021

DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:16-CV-538. Electronic ROA due on 10/21/2021. [21-40629] (CAG) [Entered: 10/06/2021 10:26 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9664998-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-40629] (CAG) [Entered: 09/15/2021 01:36 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2021

DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland and Thompson Thrift Construction, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [21-40629] (ABT) [Entered: 09/10/2021 10:05 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Thompson Thrift Construction, Incorporated and Fidelity & Deposit Company of Marylandfor the Court to process. Date of service: 09/09/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Ayers, Faria; Attorney for Appellee: Collier. [21-40629] (Marc James Ayers ) [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:26 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2021

DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marc James Ayers for party(s) Appellant Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland Appellant Thompson Thrift Construction, Incorporated, in case 21-40629 [21-40629] (ABT) [Entered: 09/07/2021 10:28 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40629] (Marc James Ayers ) [Entered: 09/03/2021 03:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland and Thompson Thrift Construction, Incorporated [21-40629] (CAG) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:53 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less