This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/13/2020 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

Cyril Pyle v. Otis Elevator Co

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Cyril Pyle filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Otis Elevator Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2393

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CYRIL PYLE

Defendant / Appellee

OTIS ELEVATOR CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sean E. Quinn Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Law Group

1500 Market Street, Suite 4000, Centre Square West

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michele N. Miller Esq.

Attorney at Lavin O'Neil Cedrone & DiSipio

190 North Independence Mall West, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Christine O. Boyd Esq.

Attorney at Lavin O'Neil Cedrone & DiSipio

190 North Independence Mall West, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Jonathan M. Freiman Esq.

Attorney at Wiggin & Dana

One Century Tower, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

13 #1

Mediation Instructions

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Otis Elevator Co. [20-2393] (JMF) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:26 AM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:25 PM]

#10

(#10) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Christine O. Boyd, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co, Jonathan M. Freiman, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co and Michele N. Miller, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 08/13/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:07 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:29 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:28 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:27 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean E. Quinn, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:26 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan M. Freiman on behalf of Appellee(s) Otis Elevator Co. [20-2393] (JMF) [Entered: 07/28/2020 11:05 AM]

#3

(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Sean E. Quinn, Esq., Christine O. Boyd, Esq., Michele N. Miller, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:50 AM]

1 #5

MEMORANDUM

1 #4

MEMORANDUM

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 07/31/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Otis Elevator Co. [20-2393] (JMF) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Christine O. Boyd, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co, Jonathan M. Freiman, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co and Michele N. Miller, Esq. for Otis Elevator Co requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 08/13/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#9) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 07/28/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/29/2020 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean E. Quinn, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Cyril Pyle. [20-2393] (SEQ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan M. Freiman on behalf of Appellee(s) Otis Elevator Co. [20-2393] (JMF) [Entered: 07/28/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Sean E. Quinn, Esq., Christine O. Boyd, Esq., Michele N. Miller, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 07/29/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Cyril Pyle in District Court No. 2-19-cv-04283. (LMR) [Entered: 07/15/2020 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine O. Boyd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M. Freiman Esq.