This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 06:25:56 (UTC).

Cynthia Ortiz v. Charles Perry, et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Cynthia Ortiz filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Charles Perry. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-10042

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHARLES PERRY, individually

DAVE ROBERSON, individually

MATTHEW POWELL, individually

JOSH BURSON, individually

Plaintiff / Appellant

CYNTHIA ORTIZ

Oklahoma City, OK 73146

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mary Kathleen Davidson

Attorney at McCleskey, Harriger, Brazill & Graf, L.L.P.

5010 University Avenue, Plainscapital Bank Building

Lubbock, TX 79413

Marion Sanford III

Attorney at McCleskey, Harriger, Brazill & Graf, L.L.P.

5010 University Avenue, Plainscapital Bank Building

Lubbock, TX 79413

David Charles Youll

2727 E. 21St Street

Tulsa, OK 74114

Jim Charles McGough Jr.

Attorney at Welsh & McGough, P.L.L.C.

2727 E. 21St Street

Tulsa, OK 74114

Norman Ray Giles

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Matt Douglas Matzner Esq.

Attorney at Crenshaw, Dupree & Milam, L.L.P.

4411 98Th Street

Lubbock, TX 79424

William S. Helfand

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Seth Byron Dennis

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Cynthia Ortiz

P.O. Box 60189

Oklahoma City, OK 73146

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

DIS-2 Order

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (Jim Charles McGough Jr.) [Entered: 02/06/2020 03:55 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Jim Charles McGough, Jr. is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [20-10042] (BPL) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (Jim Charles McGough Jr.) [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Mary Kathleen Davidson for Mr. Charles Perry for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10042] (Mary Kathleen Davidson ) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:49 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER denying motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Ms. Cynthia Ortiz. Appellant may refile after they have reviewed the 5th Circuit CM/ECF information page and certify that they have reviewed all the documents under the NextGen References Section. [ # 9240608-2 ] [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:42 AM]

Open Document #3

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #2

Unfiled Motion for IFP

Open Document #1

Unfiled appearance form

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Cynthia Ortiz for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9240608-2]. [20-10042] (MFY) [Entered: 01/29/2020 04:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Norman Ray Giles for Mr. Matthew Powell for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10042] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 01/23/2020 01:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 01/23/2020 12:51 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Seth Byron Dennis for Mr. Josh Burson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (Seth Byron Dennis ) [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:03 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9234379-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 02/06/2020 for Appellant Cynthia Ortiz [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2020 08:06 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Cynthia Ortiz [20-10042] (AS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 12:07 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter. [9252900-2] [20-10042] (RLL) [Entered: 02/17/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jim Charles McGough Jr. for party(s) Appellee Dave Roberson, in case 20-10042 [20-10042] (RSM) [Entered: 02/10/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (Jim Charles McGough Jr.) [Entered: 02/06/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Jim Charles McGough, Jr. is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [20-10042] (BPL) [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (Jim Charles McGough Jr.) [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Marion Sanford III for Appellee Charles Perry in 20-10042 [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/31/2020 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Marion Sanford, III for Mr. Charles Perry for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (Marion Sanford III) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mary Kathleen Davidson for Appellee Charles Perry in 20-10042 [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Mary Kathleen Davidson for Mr. Charles Perry for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10042] (Mary Kathleen Davidson ) [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER denying motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Ms. Cynthia Ortiz. Appellant may refile after they have reviewed the 5th Circuit CM/ECF information page and certify that they have reviewed all the documents under the NextGen References Section. [ # 9240608-2 ] [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 07:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form and motion for IFP received from Appellant Ms. Cynthia Ortiz because they are unnecessary [20-10042] (MFY) [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Cynthia Ortiz for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9240608-2]. [20-10042] (MFY) [Entered: 01/29/2020 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Norman Ray Giles for Appellee Matthew Powell in 20-10042 [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellee Matthew Powell in 20-10042 [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Norman Ray Giles for Mr. Matthew Powell for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10042] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 01/23/2020 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 01/23/2020 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Seth Byron Dennis for Appellee Josh Burson in 20-10042 [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Seth Byron Dennis for Mr. Josh Burson for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10042] (Seth Byron Dennis ) [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9234379-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 02/06/2020 for Appellant Cynthia Ortiz [20-10042] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2020 08:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Cynthia Ortiz [20-10042] (AS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less