This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/12/2022 at 06:02:46 (UTC).

Custom Hair Designs by Sandy, et al v. Central Payment Co.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Custom Hair Designs by Sandy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Central Payment Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3854

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Custom Hair Designs by Sandy, LLC, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Skip's Precision Welding, LLC, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellant

Central Payment Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adam S. Davis

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112-0000

Eric David Barton I

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112-0000

Melody R. Dickson

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112-0000

Tyler W. Hudson

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112-0000

Matthew C. Klase

Attorney at WEBB & KLASE

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, S.E.

Atlanta, GA 30339-0000

Sarah Steen Ruane

Attorney at WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL

Suite 300, 4740 Grand Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64112-0000

Edward Adam Webb

Attorney at WEBB & KLASE

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, S.E.

Atlanta, GA 30339-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

David L. Balser

Attorney at KING & SPALDING

Suite 1600, 1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Jonathan R. Chally

Attorney at COUNCILL & GUNNEMANN

Building 400, Suite 100, 1201 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30361

Kenneth W. Hartman

Attorney at BAIRD & HOLM

1500 Woodmen Tower, 1700 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Brandon R. Keel

Attorney at KING & SPALDING

Suite 1600, 1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Nicholas F. Miller

Attorney at BAIRD & HOLM

1500 Woodmen Tower, 1700 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Allison H. White

Attorney at KING & SPALDING

Suite 1600, 1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Ashley Charles Parrish

Attorney at KING & SPALDING

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-4707

Amy R. Upshaw

Attorney at KING & SPALDING

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-4707

 

Court Documents

Open Document

JUDGE ORDER: The joint [ # 5117915-2 ] motion to hold the case in abeyance pending approval of settlement is granted. The parties are to file a status report regarding the developments in the case by March 21, 2022. Adp Jan 2022 [5118223] [21-3854] (HAG) [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:16 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to hold case in abeyance, filed by Attorney Mr. Tyler W. Hudson for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding and Attorney Mr. Jonathan R. Chally for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 01/18/2022. [5117915] [21-3854]--[Edited to correct filing relief 01/18/2022 by AMT] (JRC) [Entered: 01/18/2022 11:23 AM]

Open Document

REPLY to response [ # 5116457-2 ] filed by Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 01/14/2022. [5117491] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 01/14/2022 02:41 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 5114001-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Tyler W. Hudson for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding , w/service 01/11/2022. [5116457] [21-3854] (TWH) [Entered: 01/11/2022 04:49 PM]

Open Document

JUDGE ORDER: Appellees are directed to file an expedited response to appellants [ # 5114001-2 ] motion for stay by January 11, 2022. Appellant should file an expedited reply by January 14, 2022. Adp Jan 2022 [5115549] [21-3854] (HAG) [Entered: 01/10/2022 08:42 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for stay pending appeal, filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan R. Chally for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 01/04/2022. [5114001] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 01/04/2022 12:58 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Kenneth W. Hartman for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/28/2021 [5112059] [21-3854] (KWH) [Entered: 12/28/2021 03:44 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Amy R. Upshaw for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/28/2021 [5111912] [21-3854] (ARU) [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:23 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Central Payment Co.. No Transcript[5111909] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Tyler Hudson for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding w/service 12/20/2021 [5109514] [21-3854] (TWH) [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:11 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Adam S. Davis for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding w/service 12/16/2021 [5108779] [21-3854] (ASD) [Entered: 12/16/2021 10:31 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Central Payment Co.. - FOR CAL [5108733] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:35 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Ashley C. Parrish for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/16/2021 [5108727] [21-3854] (ACP) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brandon R. Keel for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/16/2021 [5108720] [21-3854] (BRK) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:24 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jonathan R. Chally for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/16/2021 [5108707] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:05 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/24/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Central Payment Co. due 01/24/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5108007] [21-3854] (CMH) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:48 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order filed 12/9/2021. [5108004] [21-3854] (CMH) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:46 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5107996] [21-3854] (CMH) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:43 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER: The joint [ # 5117915-2 ] motion to hold the case in abeyance pending approval of settlement is granted. The parties are to file a status report regarding the developments in the case by March 21, 2022. Adp Jan 2022 [5118223] [21-3854] (HAG) [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to hold case in abeyance, filed by Attorney Mr. Tyler W. Hudson for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding and Attorney Mr. Jonathan R. Chally for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 01/18/2022. [5117915] [21-3854]--[Edited to correct filing relief 01/18/2022 by AMT] (JRC) [Entered: 01/18/2022 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY to response [ # 5116457-2 ] filed by Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 01/14/2022. [5117491] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 01/14/2022 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE in opposition to motion [ # 5114001-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Tyler W. Hudson for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding , w/service 01/11/2022. [5116457] [21-3854] (TWH) [Entered: 01/11/2022 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER: Appellees are directed to file an expedited response to appellants [ # 5114001-2 ] motion for stay by January 11, 2022. Appellant should file an expedited reply by January 14, 2022. Adp Jan 2022 [5115549] [21-3854] (HAG) [Entered: 01/10/2022 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for stay pending appeal, filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan R. Chally for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 01/04/2022. [5114001] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 01/04/2022 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kenneth W. Hartman for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/28/2021 [5112059] [21-3854] (KWH) [Entered: 12/28/2021 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Amy R. Upshaw for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/28/2021 [5111912] [21-3854] (ARU) [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Central Payment Co.. No Transcript[5111909] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Central Payment Co. - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/28/2021 [5111906] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Melody R. Dickson for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding w/service 12/20/2021 [5109518] [21-3854] (MRD) [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Tyler Hudson for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding w/service 12/20/2021 [5109514] [21-3854] (TWH) [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Adam S. Davis for Appellees Custom Hair Designs by Sandy and Skip's Precision Welding w/service 12/16/2021 [5108779] [21-3854] (ASD) [Entered: 12/16/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Central Payment Co.. - FOR CAL [5108733] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ashley C. Parrish for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/16/2021 [5108727] [21-3854] (ACP) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Brandon R. Keel for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/16/2021 [5108720] [21-3854] (BRK) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jonathan R. Chally for Appellant Central Payment Co. w/service 12/16/2021 [5108707] [21-3854] (JRC) [Entered: 12/16/2021 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 01/24/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Central Payment Co. due 01/24/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5108007] [21-3854] (CMH) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order filed 12/9/2021. [5108004] [21-3854] (CMH) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5107996] [21-3854] (CMH) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon R. Keel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth W. Hartman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley C. Parrish

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan R. Chally