This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 06:08:16 (UTC).

Curtis Williamson v. Richard Graham, Jr.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Curtis Williamson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Richard Graham, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6209

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

JANET GILMORE, PA

Defendant / Appellees

KIMBERLY MARTIN, RN

RICHARD GRAHAM, JR., Warden

DOCTOR ASHRAF

DR. R. BARRERA

PEGGY MAHLER, PA

DOCTOR DR. JOUBERT

WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellant

CURTIS WILLIAMSON

Cumberland, MD 21502-2150

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Gina Marie Smith Esq.

Attorney at MEYERS, RODBELL & ROSENBAUM, PA

6801 Kenilworth Avenue

Riverdale Park, MD 20737

Joseph Barry Chazen

Attorney at MEYERS, RODBELL & ROSENBAUM, PA

6801 Kenilworth Avenue

Riverdale Park, MD 20737

Douglas Conrad Meister

Attorney at MEYERS, RODBELL & ROSENBAUM, PA

6801 Kenilworth Avenue

Riverdale Park, MD 20737

Stephanie Judith Lane-Weber

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND

200 St. Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Curtis Williamson

Attorney at WESTERN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

13800 Mcmullen Highway, Sw

Cumberland, MD 21502-2150

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000474188] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:33 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01915-GLR. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:49 AM]

#4

(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/22/2019. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:36 PM]

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler and Kimberly Martin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000474189] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:34 PM]

#7

(#7) MOTION by Curtis Williamson to extend filing time for informal opening brief and plra forms by 30-60 days. Date and method of service: 02/15/2019 US mail. [1000464458] [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:55 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER filed [1000468842] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Curtis Williamson, #445292/1286857. Copies to all parties.. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:47 PM]

10 #2

Exhibits

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Curtis Williamson ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:29 PM]

#16

(#16) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler, Kimberly Martin and Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. [19-6209]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by CT, clarify type of brief]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by MFT - event modified] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:41 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 03/04/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler, Kimberly Martin and Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. [1000474187] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:32 PM]

10 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

#8

(#8) ORDER filed [1000465073] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief and PLRA documents due 04/04/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:09 AM]

10 #3

Envelope

#17

(#17) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Curtis Williamson. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:26 PM]

6 #1

Letter (copy)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Curtis Williamson. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler, Kimberly Martin and Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. [19-6209]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by CT, clarify type of brief]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by MFT - event modified] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler and Kimberly Martin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000474189] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000474188] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler, Kimberly Martin and Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. [1000474187] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#12) PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Curtis Williamson. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER filed [1000468842] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Curtis Williamson, #445292/1286857. Copies to all parties.. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Curtis Williamson. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • (#9) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Curtis Williamson. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER filed [1000465073] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief and PLRA documents due 04/04/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Curtis Williamson to extend filing time for informal opening brief and plra forms by 30-60 days. Date and method of service: 02/15/2019 US mail. [1000464458] [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DOCUMENT (copy of NOA) by Curtis Williamson. [1000460711] [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • (#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD & SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01915-GLR. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/11/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/22/2019. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 03/04/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Curtis Williamson ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01915-GLR. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.