This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2020 at 06:04:38 (UTC).

CTA, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 CTA filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Xavier Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55107

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, in her official capacity as Labor Commissioner of the State of California, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement

JULIE SU, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Labor Workforce and Development Agency

ANDRE SCHOORL, in his official capacity as the Acting Director of the Department of Industrial Relations of the State of California

PATRICK W. HENNING, in his official capacity as the Director of the Employment Development Department

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of California

JULIE A. SU, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Labor Workforce and Development Agency

Plaintiff / Appellees

CALIFORNIA TRUCKING ASSOCIATION

THOMAS ODOM

RAVINDER SINGH

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant

INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS

Amicus Curiae

CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS ASSOCIATION

CITY OF OAKLAND

CALIFORNIA LABOR FEDERATION, AFL-CIO

LOS ANGELES CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Evan Mark Tager

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Alexander M. Chemers

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

400 S. Hope Street, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Spencer C. Skeen Esquire

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

4370 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 990

San Diego, CA 92122

Miriam R. Nemetz

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Robert R. Roginson Esquire III

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

400 S. Hope Street, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Andrew Tauber

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Stacey Leyton

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Andrew Kushner

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Shannon Liss-Riordan Esquire

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

Danielle Luce Goldstein

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

200 North Spring Street, 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

David A. Rosenfeld

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

1001 Marina Village Parkway

Alameda, CA 94501

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) Filed (ECF) Appellees California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom and Ravinder Singh in 20-55106, 20-55107 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/06/2020. Date of service: 03/23/2020. [11639006] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Nemetz, Miriam) [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:06 PM]

#33

(#33) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 30 ] submitted by Los Angeles City Attorney's Office and City of Oakland is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11636454] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:46 AM]

#32

(#32) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 27 ] submitted by California Labor Federation, AFL-CIO is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11636445] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:43 AM]

#27

(#27) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by California Labor Federation. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11634243] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Rosenfeld, David) [Entered: 03/18/2020 02:18 PM]

#24

No Description Available

22 #1

ER Vol 1

#21

No Description Available

20 #1

Reply in Support of Motion for Stay of Preliminary Injunction Pending Trial

#19

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

14 #2

Declaration of Andrew Kushner in Support of Motion for Stay of Preliminary Injun

14 #1

Motion for Stay of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal

13 #2

Declaration of Andrew Kushner in Support of Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension

13 #1

Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Briefs

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Filed (ECF) Appellees California Trucking Association, Thomas Odom and Ravinder Singh in 20-55106, 20-55107 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/06/2020. Date of service: 03/23/2020. [11639006] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Nemetz, Miriam) [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 30 ] submitted by Los Angeles City Attorney's Office and City of Oakland is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11636454] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 27 ] submitted by California Labor Federation, AFL-CIO is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11636445] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#31) Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae California Labor Federation, AFL-CIO in 20-55106 and 20-55107. [11636429] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The Los Angeles City Attorney and the City of Oakland. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11634687] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Goldstein, Danielle) [Entered: 03/18/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#29) Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending CELA in 20-55106 and 20-55107. [11634465] [20-55106, 20-55107] (HH) [Entered: 03/18/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Filed (ECF) California Employment Lawyers Association Motion to extend time to file amicus brief until 03/31/2020. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11634424] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Entered: 03/18/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by California Labor Federation. Date of service: 03/18/2020. [11634243] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Rosenfeld, David) [Entered: 03/18/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Filed (ECF) California Employment Lawyers Association Motion to extend time to file amicus brief until 03/25/2020. Date of service: 03/17/2020. [11632073] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 23 ] submitted by State Appellants is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11627530] [20-55106, 20-55107] (LA) [Entered: 03/12/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#10) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11583688]. [20-55107] (AD) [Entered: 02/03/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11583685]. [20-55107] (AD) [Entered: 02/03/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellants Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Patrick W. Henning, Andre Schoorl and Julie Su in 20-55106 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/03/2020. [11583550] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) [Entered: 02/03/2020 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant IBT in 20-55107 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/03/2020. [11583466] [20-55106, 20-55107] (Leyton, Stacey) [Entered: 02/03/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 20-55106 and 20-55107. The appeals, filed January 29, 2020, are preliminary injunction appeals. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaires are due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief(s) and excerpts of record are due not later than February 26, 2020; the consolidated answering brief is due March 25, 2020, or 28 days after service of the last-filed opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief(s) are due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. A review of this courts docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for appeal No. 20-55106 remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment. Failure to pay the fees or failure to timely file the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11580087] [20-55106, 20-55107] (AF) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Andrew Tauber, Evan Mark Tager, Miriam R. Nemetz for party(s) Appellee Ravinder Singh Appellee Thomas Odom Appellee California Trucking Association, in case 20-55107. [11579789] (CW) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Miriam R. Nemetz (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellees California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh and Thomas Odom. Date of service: 01/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11579775] [20-55107] (Nemetz, Miriam) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Tauber (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellees California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh and Thomas Odom. Date of service: 01/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11579769] [20-55107] (Tauber, Andrew) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Evan M. Tager (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellees California Trucking Association, Ravinder Singh and Thomas Odom. Date of service: 01/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11579751] [20-55107] (Tager, Evan) [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [11579182] (JBS) [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Teamsters is a litigant

Latest cases where California Trucking Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Avi Rosenfeld