This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/18/2022 at 06:03:34 (UTC).

Crystal Rivers v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Crystal Rivers filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2408

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CRYSTAL VL RIVERS

Lynchburg, VA 24501

Defendant / Appellees

VIRGINIA STATE POLICE

BILL TALBOTT

VIRGINIA STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION

BANK OF THE JAMES FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., a/k/a Bank of the James

SELECT BANK FINANCIAL CORP

SELECT BANK

J. MICHAEL THOMAS

OLD DOMINION NATIONAL BANK

MARK MERRILL

KELLY POTTER

UNION BANKSHARES CORPORATION, now Atlantic Union Bankshares

UNION BANK AND TRUST, now Atlantic Union Bank; successor of and formerly StellarOne Bank, formerly Planters Bank & Trust Company of Virginia

ADVANTAGE TITLE & CLOSING LLC

JENNIFER RICHARDSON

MATT FARISS

SHANA LESTER

RALPH BECK

S & R FARM, LLC

BBOYZ LLC

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Crystal VL Rivers

Attorney at RIVERS PARALEGAL SERVICES

3831 Old Forest Road

Lynchburg, VA 24501

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Elaine Duross McCafferty

Attorney at WOODS ROGERS, PLC

123 East Main Street, P. O. Box 2496

Charlottesville, VA 22902-0000

Eric Daniel Chapman

Attorney at COWANPERRY PC

2270 Kraft Drive

Blacksburg, VA 24060

J.P. McGuire Boyd Jr.

Attorney at WILLIAMS MULLEN

P. O. Box 1320

Richmond, VA 23218-1320

Justin Scott Feinman

Attorney at WILLIAMS MULLEN

P. O. Box 1320

Richmond, VA 23218-1320

William Earl Phillips

Attorney at CASKIE & FROST

2306 Atherholt Road, P. O. Box 6320

Lynchburg, VA 24505-0000

Maurice Scott Fisher Jr.

Attorney at HARMAN CLAYTOR CORRIGAN & WELLMAN

4951 Lake Brook Drive

Glen Allen, VA 23060-9272

Edward Albion Armfield

Attorney at OVERSTREET SLOAN, PLLC

300 Enterprise Drive

Forest, VA 24551

John Benjamin Rottenborn

Attorney at WOODS ROGERS, PLC

Wells Fargo Tower, 10 South Jefferson Street

Roanoke, VA 24038-4125

Other Attorneys

Chad Allan Mooney

Attorney at PETTY LIVINGSTON DAWSON & RICHARDS

925 Main Street

Lynchburg, VA 24504

David Edmundson

595 Legacy Lakes Way

Aberdeen, NC 28315

Kelly Edmundson

595 Legacy Lakes Way

Aberdeen, NC 28315

Alexander Spotswood de Witt

Attorney at FREEBORN & PETERS, LLP

901 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Bevin Ray Alexander Esq. Jr.

Attorney at FREEMAN, DUNN, ALEXANDER, GAY, LUCY & COATES, P.C.

1045 Cottontown Road

Lynchburg, VA 24503-0000

Bryan Grimes Williams Creasy Sr.

Attorney at JOHNSON AYERS & MATTHEWS, PLC

310 1St Street, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

John Dickens Eure

Attorney at JOHNSON AYERS & MATTHEWS, PLC

310 1St Street, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

 

Court Documents

#65

(#5) ORDER filed consolidating case 21-2408 with 21-2248 (L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David and Kelly Edmundson. [1001077733] [21-2248, 21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:05 AM]

#66

(#6) Amended INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: David and Kelly Edmundson. [1001077750] Informal Opening Brief due 01/13/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2248, 21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:18 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00061-EKD-JCH. Case manager: RachelLee. [1001077698] [21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:51 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [3]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Edmundson and Kelly Edmundson. [1001077724] [21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:01 AM]

#7

(#7) MOTION by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix Jurisdictional issue / Time Sensitive motion to determine jurisdiction until Two weeks after Determination of jurisdiction. , to exceed length limitations for informal brief. Date and method of service: 01/11/2022 ecf. [1001090592] [21-2248, 21-2408] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 01/11/2022 07:21 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30.; granting Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 7 ]. Total words: 14,300. Informal Opening Brief due 02/14/2022. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David and Kelly Edmundson. [1001090910] [21-2248, 21-2408] RJL [Entered: 01/12/2022 10:41 AM]

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001110337] [21-2248, 21-2408] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:55 AM]

#11

(#11) INFORMAL APPENDIX by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001110338] [21-2248, 21-2408]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by RJL- pages upside down; document reuploaded] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/15/2022 05:00 AM]

#12

(#12) CORRECTION to INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001110339] [21-2248, 21-2408]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by RJL- docket text edited] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/15/2022 05:12 AM]

#13

(#13) MOTION by Bank of the James Financial Group, Inc. in 21-2248 to extend filing time for informal response brief until March 14, 2022.. Date and method of service: 02/16/2022 ecf. [1001111969] [21-2248, 21-2408] Elaine McCafferty [Entered: 02/16/2022 07:53 PM]

14 #1

Docketing statement objection/correction

14 #2

Additional Document

14 #3

Additional Document

14 #4

Additional Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORRECTION to INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001112147] [21-2248, 21-2408]--[Edited 02/17/2022 by RJL - docket text edited] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/17/2022 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Bank of the James Financial Group, Inc. in 21-2248 to extend filing time for informal response brief until March 14, 2022.. Date and method of service: 02/16/2022 ecf. [1001111969] [21-2248, 21-2408] Elaine McCafferty [Entered: 02/16/2022 07:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORRECTION to INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001110339] [21-2248, 21-2408]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by RJL- docket text edited] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/15/2022 05:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INFORMAL APPENDIX by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001110338] [21-2248, 21-2408]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by RJL- pages upside down; document reuploaded] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/15/2022 05:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001110337] [21-2248, 21-2408] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [ENTRY RESTRICTED] INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408. [1001110335] [21-2248, 21-2408]--[Edited 02/15/2022 by RJL - see ECF #70 for correct brief] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/14/2022 11:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30.; granting Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 7 ]. Total words: 14,300. Informal Opening Brief due 02/14/2022. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David and Kelly Edmundson. [1001090910] [21-2248, 21-2408] RJL [Entered: 01/12/2022 10:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers in 21-2248, 21-2408 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix Jurisdictional issue / Time Sensitive motion to determine jurisdiction until Two weeks after Determination of jurisdiction. , to exceed length limitations for informal brief. Date and method of service: 01/11/2022 ecf. [1001090592] [21-2248, 21-2408] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 01/11/2022 07:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: David and Kelly Edmundson. [1001077750] Informal Opening Brief due 01/13/2022. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2248, 21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed consolidating case 21-2408 with 21-2248 (L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David and Kelly Edmundson. [1001077733] [21-2248, 21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [3]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Edmundson and Kelly Edmundson. [1001077724] [21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) IFP APPLICATION transferred from district court (court access only). [1001077721] [21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 11:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00061-EKD-JCH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. Record is split into 10 separate parts [1001077716] [21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00061-EKD-JCH. Case manager: RachelLee. [1001077698] [21-2408] RJL [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNION BANKSHARES CORPORATION, now Atlantic Union Bankshares is a litigant