This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2019 at 09:31:22 (UTC).

Crystal Kocsis v. Florida State University Board

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Crystal Kocsis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Florida State University Board. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11098

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CRYSTAL LEANNE KOCSIS

Alexis, NC 28006-0459

Defendant / Appellee

FLORIDA STATE UNIVERSITY BOARD OF TRUSTEES, Florida Public Entity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Crystal Leanne Kocsis

Po Box 459

Alexis, NC 28006-0459

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mallory Bennett

Attorney at Thompson Crawford & Smiley

1330 Thomasville Rd

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Thomas Robert Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Crawford & Smiley

1330 Thomasville Rd

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Thomas Robert Thompson for Appellee Florida State University Board of Trustees. Appellee's Brief due on 5/29/19; 14 DAY EXT GRANTED TO 06/12/2019 as to Appellee Florida State University Board of Trustees.. [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:57 PM]

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mallory Bennett for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:17 PM]

Open Document #1

Motions Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Robert Thompson for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:16 PM]

Open Document #2

DC #77 Order of Dimsissal

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Crystal Leanne Kocsis. Service date: 04/29/2019 [19-11098] Attorney for Appellee: Bennett - email; Attorney for Appellee: Thompson - email. [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:02 PM]

Open Document

***ENTERED IN ERROR***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mallory Bennett for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098]--[Edited 05/06/2019 by AGW] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:46 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Crystal Leanne Kocsis. [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:56 AM]

Open Document

***ENTERED IN ERROR***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Robert Thompson for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098]--[Edited 05/06/2019 by AGW] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:44 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11098] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:16 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-9 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC #78 Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's motion for leave to use the original record without an appendix, construed as a MOTION to suspend rules filed by Appellant Crystal Leanne Kocsis. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8768803-1] [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mallory Bennett for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Robert Thompson for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Thomas Robert Thompson for Appellee Florida State University Board of Trustees. Appellee's Brief due on 5/29/19; 14 DAY EXT GRANTED TO 06/12/2019 as to Appellee Florida State University Board of Trustees.. [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Mallory Bennett and Robert Thompson for Florida State University Board of Trustees because you must use the Court's appearance of counsel form. Counsel must file a corrected Appearance of Counsel form. [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***ENTERED IN ERROR***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mallory Bennett for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098]--[Edited 05/06/2019 by AGW] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***ENTERED IN ERROR***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Robert Thompson for Florida State University Board of Trustees. [19-11098]--[Edited 05/06/2019 by AGW] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Crystal Leanne Kocsis. Service date: 04/29/2019 [19-11098] Attorney for Appellee: Bennett - email; Attorney for Appellee: Thompson - email. [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Thomas Robert Thompson for Florida State University Board of Trustees. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11098] (ECF: Thomas Thompson) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Crystal Leanne Kocsis. [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Crystal Leanne Kocsis on 03/21/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/01/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/05/2019 as to Appellant Crystal Leanne Kocsis. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/19/2019 as to Appellee Florida State University Board of Trustees [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.