This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:04:27 (UTC).

Cruz-Oquendo v. FDIC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Cruz-Oquendo filed an Other lawsuit against FDIC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1234

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

AIDA L. CRUZ-OQUENDO

Defendant / Appellees

BANCO POPULAR DE PUERTO RICO

FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, as Receiver for Doral Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John E. Mudd

Attorney at Law Offices of John E. Mudd

Po Box 194134

San Juan, PR 00919-4134

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Roberto Abesada-Aguet

Attorney at Correa Acevedo & Abesada PSC

Centro Internacional De Mercadeo, Torre Ii, #90 Carr 165, Ste 407

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Sergio E. Criado-Mangual

Attorney at Correa Acevedo & Abesada PSC

Centro Internacional De Mercadeo, Torre Ii, #90 Carr 165, Ste 407

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Mariana E. Bauza Almonte

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

J. Scott Watson

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr

Arlington, VA 22226

Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli

Po Box 79897

Carolina, PR 00984-9897

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Brief due 06/12/2019 for appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Appendix due 06/12/2019 for appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. [19-1234] (CP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:18 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1234] (JEM) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:06 AM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Banco Popular de Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Sergio E. Criado. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2017. [19-1234] (SEC) [Entered: 03/19/2019 05:06 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1234] (JEM) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:09 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo filed by Attorney John E. Mudd. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1234] (JEM) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:08 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FDIC filed by Attorney J. Scott Watson. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1234] (JSW) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:36 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Brief due 06/12/2019 for appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Appendix due 06/12/2019 for appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. [19-1234] (CP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1234] (JEM) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/13/2019 for appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Appendix due 05/13/2019 for appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1234] (CP) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Banco Popular de Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Sergio E. Criado. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2017. [19-1234] (SEC) [Entered: 03/19/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1234] (JEM) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo filed by Attorney John E. Mudd. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1234] (JEM) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FDIC filed by Attorney J. Scott Watson. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1234] (JSW) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #47) filed by Appellant Aida L. Cruz-Oquendo. Docketing Statement due 03/26/2019. Appearance form due 03/26/2019. [19-1234] (CP) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less