This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/18/2019 at 06:23:03 (UTC).

Crowson v. Washington County State, Utah, et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 Crowson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Washington County State, Utah. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4118

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

JUDD LAROWE

JON WORLTON

Defendant / Appellants

WASHINGTON COUNTY STATE OF UTAH

MICHAEL JOHNSON

CORY PULSIPHER, acting Sheriff of Washington County

Plaintiff / Appellee

MARTIN CROWSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Gary T. Wight

Attorney at Kipp and Christian

10 Exchange Place, Fourth Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-0000

Shawn McGarry

Attorney at Kipp and Christian

10 Exchange Place, Fourth Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Frank D. Mylar Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Mylar Law

2494 Bengal Boulevard

Salt Lake City, UT 84121

Andrew R. Hopkins

Attorney at Mylar Law

2494 Bengal Boulevard

Salt Lake City, UT 84121

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan J. Schriever

Attorney at Schriever Law Firm

10813 South River Front Parkway, Suite 460

South Jordan, UT 84095

Megha Ram

Attorney at Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center

777 6Th St. Nw, 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Anthony Balkissoon

Attorney at Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center

777 6Th St. Nw, 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10687788] Entry of appearance filed by Megha Ram for Martin Crowson in 19-4118, 19-4120. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118, 19-4120] [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:55 AM]

Open Document

[10687047] Entry of appearance filed by Anthony Balkissoon for Martin Crowson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4118] [Entered: 10/15/2019 12:38 PM]

Open Document

[10675720] Order filed by Clerk of the Court procedurally consolidating appeals 19-4118 and 19-4120. See order for detailed briefing instructions. Served on 09/04/2019. [19-4118, 19-4120] [Entered: 09/04/2019 09:49 AM]

Open Document

[10675630] Entry of appearance filed by Ryan J. Schriever for Martin Crowson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4118] [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:48 AM]

Open Document

[10675595] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew R. Hopkins and Mr. Frank D. Mylar, Jr., Esq. for Washington County State of Utah, Mr. Michael Johnson and Cory Pulsipher. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:48 PM]

Open Document

[10675529] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Michael Johnson, Cory Pulsipher and Washington County State of Utah. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118] FDM [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:30 PM]

Open Document

[10675526] Notice that the necessary transcript was ordered in appeal No. 19-4120 filed by Mr. Michael Johnson, Washington County State of Utah and Cory Pulsipher. Served on: 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/03/2019 by MLB - transcript was previously ordered in 19-4120] [19-4118] --[Edited docket text 09/12/2019 by SLS.] FDM [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:27 PM]

Open Document #3

New General Dkt Letter With Counsel

Open Document #2

Preliminary Reocrd

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10687788] Entry of appearance filed by Megha Ram for Martin Crowson in 19-4118, 19-4120. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118, 19-4120] [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • [10687760] Entry of appearance submitted by Megha Ram for Appellee Martin Crowson in 19-4118, 19-4120 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118, 19-4120]--[Edited 10/17/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 10/17/19.] MR [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10687047] Entry of appearance filed by Anthony Balkissoon for Martin Crowson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4118] [Entered: 10/15/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • [10687040] Entry of appearance submitted by Tony Balkissoon for Appellee Martin Crowson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118] --[Edited 10/15/2019 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 10/15/19] AB [Entered: 10/15/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10675720] Order filed by Clerk of the Court procedurally consolidating appeals 19-4118 and 19-4120. See order for detailed briefing instructions. Served on 09/04/2019. [19-4118, 19-4120] [Entered: 09/04/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10675630] Entry of appearance filed by Ryan J. Schriever for Martin Crowson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4118] [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • [10675620] Entry of appearance submitted by Ryan John Schriever for Appellee Martin Crowson in 19-4118 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by DD to remove from 19-4120] --[Edited 09/04/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 9/4/19] RJS [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10675595] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew R. Hopkins and Mr. Frank D. Mylar, Jr., Esq. for Washington County State of Utah, Mr. Michael Johnson and Cory Pulsipher. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • [10675542] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 09/11/2019 for Kelly Hicken (Motion Hearing for Summary Judgment 12/19/18. - ordered in 19-4120). (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4118] [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10675529] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Michael Johnson, Cory Pulsipher and Washington County State of Utah. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118] FDM [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10675526] Notice that the necessary transcript was ordered in appeal No. 19-4120 filed by Mr. Michael Johnson, Washington County State of Utah and Cory Pulsipher. Served on: 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/03/2019 by MLB - transcript was previously ordered in 19-4120] [19-4118] --[Edited docket text 09/12/2019 by SLS.] FDM [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • [10675517] Entry of appearance submitted by Frank D. Mylar, Andrew R. Hopkins for Appellants Mr. Michael Johnson, Washington County State of Utah and Cory Pulsipher for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4118]--[Edited 09/03/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 9/3/19.] FDM [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10671722] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/19/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 09/03/2019 for Michael Johnson, Cory Pulsipher and Washington County, State of Utah. Notice of appearance also due on 09/03/2019 for Martin Crowson. [19-4118] [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary T. Wight