This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/04/2020 at 06:18:03 (UTC).

Crown Castle NG East LLC v. The Town of Oyster Bay

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Crown Castle NG East LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Town of Oyster Bay. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1749

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

John Bishop, in his official capacity as Deputy Commissioner of the Town of Oyster Bay Highway Department

Town of Oyster Bay

Richard Lenz, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Town of Oyster Bay Highway Department and Department of Public Works

Town of Oyster Bay Town Board

Plaintiff / Appellant

Crown Castle NG East LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Todd C. Steckler Esq.

Attorney at The Steckler Law Firm

656 Dacosta Avenue

Oceanside, NY 11572

Donna A. Napolitano Esq.

Attorney at Berkman, Henoch, Peterson, Peddy & Fenchel, P.C.

100 Garden City Plaza

Garden City, NY 11530

Joseph Edward Macy Esq.

Attorney at Berkman, Henoch, Peterson, Peddy & Fenchel, P.C.

100 Garden City Plaza

Garden City, NY 11530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert D. Gaudioso Esq.

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

Carlotta Cassidy Esq.

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

 

Court Documents

#37

#34

#30

#28

#23

22 #4

Supporting Document

22 #3

Supporting Document

22 #2

Supporting Document

22 #1

Form C FILED

12 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#10

#8

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/14/2020, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2886203] [20-1749] [Entered: 07/16/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC Brief due date as 09/18/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 09/18/2020, FILED.[2873930] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/30/2020 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 09/18/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2867862] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2867214] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/22/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, FILED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2866376] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, FILED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2866374] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, FILED.[2866316] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, FILED.[2866314] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY, Carlotta Cassidy for Crown Castle NG East LLC, in case 20-1749, [ # 18 ], ADDED.[2866312] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, FILED. Service date 06/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2866302] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/19/2020 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2861924] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Joseph E. Macy, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Todd C. Steckler, SUBSTITUTED.[2861902] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John Bishop, Richard Lenz, Town of Oyster Bay and Town of Oyster Bay Town Board, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2861853] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY, Donna A. Napolitano for Richard Lenz, John Bishop, Town of Oyster Bay Town Board and Town of Oyster Bay, in case 20-1749, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2861708] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/15/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John Bishop, Richard Lenz, Town of Oyster Bay and Town of Oyster Bay Town Board, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2861673] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/15/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2855847] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/06/2020 02:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12888870, FILED.[2855846] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/06/2020 02:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/12/2020, RECEIVED.[2855845] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/06/2020 02:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/11/2020, RECEIVED.[2855844] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/06/2020 02:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Crown Castle NG East LLC, FILED. [2855843] [20-1749] [Entered: 06/06/2020 02:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Castle NG East LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlotta Cassidy Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert D. Gaudioso