This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/27/2021 at 06:15:38 (UTC).

Crow Indian Tribe, et al v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Crow Indian Tribe filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35811

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

CROW INDIAN TRIBE

CROW CREEK SIOUX TRIBE

STANDING ROCK SIOUX TRIBE

PIIKANI NATION

THE CRAZY DOG SOCIETY

HOPI NATION BEAR CLAN

NORTHERN ARAPAHO ELDERS SOCIETY

DAVID BEARSHIELD

KENNY BOWEKATY

LLEVANDO FISHER

ELISE GROUND

ARVOL LOOKING HOUSE

TRAVIS PLAITED HAIR

JIMMY ST. GODDARD

PETE STANDING ALONE

NOLAN J. YELLOW KIDNEY

THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES

THE FUND FOR ANIMALS

WILDEARTH GUARDIANS

NORTHERN CHEYENNE TRIBE

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey Scott Rasmussen

Attorney at Patterson Earnhart Real Bird & Wilson LLP

1900 Plaza Drive

Louisville, CO 80027

Kristine M. Akland

Attorney at Akland Law Firm PLLC

317 E. Spruce Street

Missoula, MT 59802

Nicholas Arrivo

Attorney at The Humane Society of the United States

1255 23Rd Street, Nwsuite 450

Washington, DC 20037

Matthew Kellogg Bishop

Attorney at Western Environmental Law Center

103 Reeder'S Alley

Helena, MT 59601

John R. Mellgren

Attorney at Western Environmental Law Center

120 Shelton Mcmurphey Boulevardsuite 340

Eugene, OR 97401

Kelly E. Nokes

Attorney at Western Environmental Law Center

P.O. Box 218

Buena Vista, CO 81211

Beth A. Baldwin

Attorney at Ziontz Chestnut

2101 4Th Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

Katherine Kirklin O'Brien

313 E Main Streetp.O. Box 4743

Bozeman, MT 59772

Timothy Joseph Preso

Attorney at Earthjustice

313 E Main Streetp.O. Box 4743

Bozeman, MT 59772

Other Attorneys

Timothy M. Bechtold Esquire

Attorney at BECHTOLD LAW FIRM PLLC

P.O. Box 7051

Missoula, MT 59807

Rebecca Kay Smith

Attorney at Public Interest Defense Center, P.C.

P.O. Box 7584317 E. Spruce St.

Missoula, MT 59807

Robert H. Aland

140 Old Green Bay Road

Winnetka, IL 60093-1512

Michael Richard Eitel

999 18Th Streetsuite 370 - South Terrace

Denver, CO 80202

Devon Lea Flanagan

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Coby Howell

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenuesuite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Thekla Hansen-Young

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Andrew Christopher Mergen Esquire

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 23795, L'Enfant Plaza Station

Washington, DC 20026-3795

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12250549] (LW) [Entered: 10/07/2021 10:47 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants USA, USDOI, USFWS and Martha Williams Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2021. [12252997] [21-35811] (Mergen, Andrew) [Entered: 10/09/2021 11:45 AM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/02/2021, 12:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12260349] (BLS) [Entered: 10/18/2021 03:31 PM]

#11

(#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/16/2021, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time (originally scheduled on 11/02/2021). [12274878] (BLS) [Entered: 11/01/2021 04:19 PM]

#14

(#14) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/10/2021. See order for details. [12293997] (BLS) [Entered: 11/19/2021 04:48 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/10/2021. See order for details. [12293997] (BLS) [Entered: 11/19/2021 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#13) Terminated Katherine Kirklin O'Brien for Sierra Club, Northern Cheyenne Tribe, National Parks Conservation Association and Center for Biological Diversity. [12276747] (RL) [Entered: 11/03/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Ms. Katherine Kirklin O'Brien for Appellees Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Northern Cheyenne Tribe and Sierra Club. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 11/03/2021. [12276582] [21-35811] (O'Brien, Katherine) [Entered: 11/03/2021 06:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/16/2021, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time (originally scheduled on 11/02/2021). [12274878] (BLS) [Entered: 11/01/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/02/2021, 12:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12260349] (BLS) [Entered: 10/18/2021 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Thekla Hansen-Young for party(s) Appellant USA Appellant Martha Williams Appellant Debra Anne Haaland Appellant USDOI Appellant Hilary Cooley Appellant USFWS, in case 21-35811. [12256553] (DJV) [Entered: 10/14/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thekla Hansen-Young (US Dept of Justice, Environment & Natural Resources Division, PO Box 7415, Washington DC 20044) for Appellants USA, USDOI, USFWS, Martha Williams, Debra Anne Haaland and Hilary Cooley. Date of service: 10/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12256544] [21-35811] (Hansen-Young, Thekla) [Entered: 10/14/2021 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/09/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12253000]. [21-35811] (AD) [Entered: 10/09/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants USA, USDOI, USFWS and Martha Williams Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/09/2021. [12252997] [21-35811] (Mergen, Andrew) [Entered: 10/09/2021 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Michael Richard Eitel in 21-35811 substituted by Attorney Andrew Christopher Mergen in 21-35811 [12250833] (DJV) [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#4) Attorneys Michael Richard Eitel, Michael Richard Eitel, Michael Richard Eitel, Michael Richard Eitel and Michael Richard Eitel in 21-35811 substituted by Attorneys Andrew Christopher Mergen, Andrew Christopher Mergen, Andrew Christopher Mergen, Andrew Christopher Mergen and Andrew Christopher Mergen in 21-35811 [12250829] (DJV) [Entered: 10/07/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Christopher Mergen (Appellate Section, Environment & Natural Resources Division, U.S. Dept. of Justice, P.O. Box 7415, Washington, D.C. 20044) for Appellants USDOI, USFWS, Martha Williams and USA. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Michael Richard Eitel for Appellants Hilary Cooley, Debra Anne Haaland, USDOI, USFWS, USA and Martha Williams. Date of service: 10/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12250824] [21-35811] (Mergen, Andrew) [Entered: 10/07/2021 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12250549] (LW) [Entered: 10/07/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Hilary Cooley, Debra Anne Haaland, U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States of America and Martha Williams Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/05/2021. Transcript ordered by 10/28/2021. Transcript due 11/29/2021. Appellants Hilary Cooley, Debra Anne Haaland, U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States of America and Martha Williams opening brief due 01/05/2022. Appellees Robert H. Aland, Alliance for the Wild Rockies, David Bearshield, Kenny Bowekaty, Center for Biological Diversity, Crow Creek Sioux Tribe, Crow Indian Tribe, Llevando Fisher, Elise Ground, Hopi Nation Bear Clan, Arvol Looking House, National Parks Conservation Association, Native Ecosystems Council, Northern Arapaho Elders Society, Northern Cheyenne Tribe, Piikani Nation, Travis Plaited Hair, Sierra Club, Jimmy St. Goddard, Pete Standing Alone, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, The Crazy Dog Society, The Fund for Animals, The Humane Society of the United States, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Nolan J. Yellow Kidney answering brief due 02/07/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12241493] (RT) [Entered: 09/28/2021 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fund For Animals is a litigant

Latest cases where The Humane Society of the United States is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R. Eitel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coby Healy Howell