This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/05/2021 at 06:13:29 (UTC).

Criscitello v. Saul

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Criscitello filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1222

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jeaninne Criscitello

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Lewis Potter Esq.

Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

445 Broadway

Albany, NY 12207

Lisa Smoller Esq.

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

625 John F. Kennedy Federal Building15 New Sudbury Street

Boston, MA 02203

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter A. Gorton Esq.

Attorney at Lachman & Gorton

1500 East Main Streetp.O. Box 89

Endicott, NY 13761

 

Court Documents

#27

#24

#23

#20

#18

#12

#11

10 #7

Supporting Document

10 #6

Supporting Document

10 #5

Supporting Document

10 #4

Supporting Document

10 #3

Supporting Document

10 #2

Supporting Document

10 #1

Form C FILED

#9

#7

#5

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/24/2021, Start Time: 9:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3121520] [21-1222] [Entered: 06/16/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ATTORNEY, Lisa Smoller, [ # 24 ], in place of attorney Christopher L. Potter, SUBSTITUTED.[3115869] [21-1222] [Entered: 06/08/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul, FILED. Service date 06/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3114795] [21-1222] [Entered: 06/07/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jeaninne Criscitello Brief due date as 08/17/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 08/17/2021, FILED.[3113415] [21-1222] [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[3113363] [21-1222] [Entered: 06/03/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/16/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3104190] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jeaninne Criscitello, informing Court of proposed due date 08/17/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 05/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3103758] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/19/2021 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jeaninne Criscitello, FILED. Service date 05/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3103757] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/19/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jeaninne Criscitello, FILED. Service date 05/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3103756] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/19/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jeaninne Criscitello, FILED. Service date 05/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3103749] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/19/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY, Christopher Lewis Potter for Andrew M. Saul, in case 21-1222, [ # 7 ], ADDED.[3098765] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul, FILED. Service date 05/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3098756] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance, [ # 5 ], in place of attorney Steven D. Clymer, SUBSTITUTED.[3098661] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/12/2021 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul, FILED. Service date 05/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3098630] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/12/2021 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3095937] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3095936] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3095935] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeaninne Criscitello, FILED. [3095928] [21-1222] [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter A. Gorton